This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 10:31:24 (UTC).

Harris County, Texas v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 Harris County, Texas filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02296

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

Defendants

PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC.

TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC

MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL INC

MYLAN INC

HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC

DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.

CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.

ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC.

VERSAPHARM INC.

HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC.

MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

Inc Pfizer

ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC

AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC

SUN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

Kavod Health, LLC

ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Debra Tsuchiyama Baker

Attorney at Connelly Baker et al

600 Travis St, Ste 700

Houston, TX 77002

PEGI S. BLOCK

Attorney at CRUSE SCOTT HENDERSON & ALLEN

600 Travis, Suite 3900

Houston, TX 77702-3005

Christopher George Hollins

Attorney at Hollins Law Group PLLC

10101 Southwest Fwy, Ste 400

Houston, TX 77074

Robert Wayne Soard

Attorney at Harris County Attorney

1019 Congress Plaza, 15Th Fl

Houston, TX 77002

John Muir

Attorney at Baker Wotring LLP

700 Jpmorgan Chase Tower, 600 Travis Street

Houston, TX 77002

Vincent Reed Ryan, Jr

Attorney at Harris County Attorney

1019 Congress, 15Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Richard Martin Schechter

Attorney at Attorney at Law

One Greenway Plaza, Ste 740

Houston, TX 77046

Suzanne Bradley

Attorney at Harris County Attorney's Office

1019 Congress, 15Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Earnest William Wotring

Attorney at Baker Wotring LLP

700 Jpmorgan Chase Tower, 600 Travis

Houston, TX 77002

JOANNE CICALA

Attorney at THE CICALA LAW FIRM PLLC

101 College Street

Dripping Springs, TX 78620

Defendant Attorneys

BENJAMIN F. HOLT

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

555 Thirteenth St Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1109

HECTOR TORRES

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

DAVID M. MAX

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

SETH B. DAVIS

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

SETH A. MOSKOWITZ

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Other Attorneys

NATHAN M. BUCHTER

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

2000 Market St 20Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

J. GORDON COONEY, JR.

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS,& BOCKIUS LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2921

ALISON TANCHYK

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOKIUS LLP

200 S. Biscayne Boulevard

Miami, FL 33131

GERALD E. ARTH

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

2000 Market St., 20Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

BRIAN J SMITH

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#37

36 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#36

#35

#34

33 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#33

#32

#31

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #2

Appendix B

1 #1

Appendix A

#1

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HARRIS COUNTY'S CLAIMS AGAINST ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., AND PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/7/2020. 7/7/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 1439 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHMIDTLEIN, JOHN) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN on behalf of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHMIDTLEIN, JOHN) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MARCH 1, 2020 COMPLAINT IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/2/2020. 7/6/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 1437 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Waive Service and Extend the Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff Harris County's March 1, 2020 Complaint by HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CICALA, JOANNE) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN F. HOLT on behalf of MYLAN INC, MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL INC, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, MYLAN SPECIALITY L.P. with Certificate of Service(HOLT, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM K. LEVIN on behalf of MYLAN INC, MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL INC, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, MYLAN SPECIALITY L.P. with Certificate of Service(LEVIN, ADAM) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN M. BUCHTER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUCHTER, NATHAN) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(WACKERLY, JOSH) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00733. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketInterdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/14/2020.] (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-11) transferring case to Eastern District of Pennsylvania to be included in MDL Docket No. 2724. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/14/2020.] (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/3/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/14/2020.] (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Harris County, Texas, filed.(Schechter, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/14/2020.] (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Charles Eskridge. Judge Nancy F Atlas no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/14/2020.] (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket(#3) RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Nancy F Atlas recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/14/2020.] (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/20/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/14/2020.] (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24293156) filed by HARRIS COUNTY, TEXAS. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Wotring, Earnest) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/14/2020.] (Entered: 03/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERSAPHARM, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC. is a litigant