This case was last updated from PACER on 09/03/2021 at 06:56:54 (UTC).

Harris County Hospital District v. McKesson Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Harris County Hospital District filed an Other lawsuit against McKesson Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01450

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Defendants

Arun Sharma

Abbott Laboratories

McKesson Corporation

Karin Sharma

Richard Arthur Evans

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

Advanced Pharma Inc.

Actavis PLC

Allergan USA Inc.

NexGen Pharma, Inc.

David Devido

Cephalon, Inc.

Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc.

Cardinal Health Inc.

Walgreens Co.

Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.

Mylan Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Allergan Sales LLC

ICU Medical Sales Inc.

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Elizabeth Weaver Scofield

Attorney at Jones Day

717 Texas Street, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77002

Michael T Gallagher

Attorney at The Gallagher Law Firm

2905 Sackett St

Houston, TX 77098

David Bruce Weinstein

Attorney at Weinstein Tippets and Little LLP

7500 San Felipe, Ste 500

Houston, TX 77063

L Sara Thomas

Attorney at Harris County Attorney's Office

2525 Holly Hall Ln, Suite 190

Houston, TX 77054

James Carlson

Attorney at Jones Day

500 Grant St., Ste. 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Matthew E Coveler

Attorney at Weinstein Tippetts Little LLP

7500 San Felipe, Suite 500

Houston, TX 77063

Conor B. O'Croinin

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

100 E. Pratt Street, Ste 2440

Baltimore, MD 21202

James W Carlson

Attorney at Jones Day

500 Grant St., Ste. 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Daniel M Downey

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1609 Shoal Creek, Suite 100

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#36

(#36) ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#35

(#35) ORDER Granting #5 MOTION to Stay , ORDER STAYING CASE #5 MOTION to Stay . Denying #8 Motion to Remand. Case is Stayed and Administratively closed. 7/28/2021(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#34

(#34) REPLY in Support of #31 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Harris County Hospital District. (Gallagher, Michael) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

31 #4

Exhibit

31 #3

Exhibit

31 #2

Exhibit

31 #1

Exhibit

#31

(#31) Opposed MOTION to Remand by Harris County Hospital District, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet - Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2021-23217 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26372183) filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet - Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Scofield, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT of Transfer received email notification : transfer of case to Northern District of Ohio. New Case # assigned: 1:21-op-45096 and received on 08/12/2021., filed. (BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketInterdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER Granting #5 MOTION to Stay , ORDER STAYING CASE #5 MOTION to Stay . Denying #8 Motion to Remand. Case is Stayed and Administratively closed. 7/28/2021(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) REPLY in Support of #31 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Harris County Hospital District. (Gallagher, Michael) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE in Opposition to #31 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Order)(Scofield, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held on 6/25/2021. Motion for Remand Filing due by 6/25/2021. Response briefs due by 7/16/2021. Plaintiff's Reply due by 7/23/2021 Appearances: Matthew E Coveler, Daniel M Downey representing Harris County Hospital District; Matthew E Coveler representing CVS; James W Carlson representing Walmart.(ERO:ERO), filed.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Opposed MOTION to Remand by Harris County Hospital District, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Resetting re: #13 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference reset for 6/25/2021 at 03:30 PM in by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. **Time Change Only** (gclairadi, 4) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Striking Document re: #8 MOTION to Remand. The motion does not comply with the Courts Procedures section 6(B) regarding pre-motion conferences required for particular motions. The motion does not comply with the Courts Procedures section 6(C)(2), which requires a certificate of conference for all motions. The motion does not comply with the Courts Procedures section 6(C)(3), which requires a separate proposed order for all motions except those filed under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand by Harris County Hospital District, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Gallagher, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge George C Hanks, Jr Parties notified, filed. (olindor, 4) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr recused. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Stay by CVS Pharmacy Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Walmart Inc. in Support of Their Motion for a Temporary Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, #2 Exhibit -1, #3 Exhibit -2, #4 Exhibit -3, #5 Exhibit -4, #6 Exhibit -5, #7 Exhibit -6, #8 Exhibit -7, #9 Exhibit -8, #10 Exhibit -9, #11 Exhibit -10, #12 Exhibit -11, #13 Exhibit -12, #14 Exhibit -13, #15 Exhibit -14, #16 Exhibit -15, #17 Exhibit -16, #18 Exhibit -17, #19 Exhibit -18, #20 Exhibit -19, #21 Exhibit -20, #22 Exhibit -21, #23 Exhibit -22, #24 Exhibit -23, #25 Exhibit -24, #26 Exhibit -25)(Weinstein, David) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. Judge Sim Lake no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (sanderson, 4) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Sim Lake recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walmart Inc., filed.(Scofield, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2021-23217 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26372183) filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet - Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Scofield, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Pharma Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ICU Medical Sales Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MYLAN INC is a litigant