This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 08:56:15 (UTC).

Harris #476889 v. Kitchka et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Harris 476889 filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Kitchka. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Jonker and Ray Kent. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00954

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Jonker

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larry Devonte Harris #476889

Ionia, MI 48846

Defendants

Christopher Becker

Erin Kitchka

William G. Kelly

Alex Grimes

Travis Early

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Financial Documents

#2

(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (clw) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#4

(#4) OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A-G

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Christopher Becker, Travis Early, Alex Grimes, William G. Kelly, Erin Kitchka filed by Larry Devonte Harris #476889 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G) (clw) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $1.67 within 28 days; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; (initial partial filing fee to be submitted by 12/12/2019); signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed for failure to state a claim ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Copy of Opinion (Screening) #4 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Larry Devonte Harris #476889 (clw) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed for failure to state a claim ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $1.67, receipt number GR068986; amount paid to date $1.67 (mkc) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Larry Devonte Harris #476889 (clw) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $1.67 within 28 days; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; (initial partial filing fee to be submitted by 12/12/2019); signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (clw) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Christopher Becker, Travis Early, Alex Grimes, William G. Kelly, Erin Kitchka filed by Larry Devonte Harris #476889 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G) (clw) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.