This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/13/2021 at 07:42:26 (UTC).

HARRIET TUBMAN FREEDOM FIGHTERS CORP et al v. LEE et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 HARRIET TUBMAN FREEDOM FIGHTERS CORP filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against LEE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK E WALKER and MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK E WALKER

Referral Judge

MARTIN A FITZPATRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIET TUBMAN FREEDOM FIGHTERS CORP

PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA FLORIDA CHAPTER

PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA CENTRAL FLORIDA CHAPTER

STEPHEN KIRK

PHYLLIS RESNICK

Defendants

ASHLEY MOODY

LAUREL LEE

KAITI LENHART

MIKE HOGAN

JOSEPH R MORGAN

LISA LEWIS

MARY JANE ARRINGTON

BILL COWLES

LORI SCOTT

CHRISTINA WHITE

TOMMY DOYLE

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EMMA CHASE BELLAMY

Attorney at SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER - DECATUR GA

Po Box 1287

Decatur, GA 30303

NANCY GBANA ABUDU

Attorney at SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER - MONTGOMERY AL

400 Washington Ave

Montgomery, AL 36104

CECILIA AGUILERA

Attorney at FAIR ELECTIONS CENTER

1825 K Street Nw, Suite 450

Washington, DC 20006

JONATHAN LEE SHERMAN

Attorney at FAIR ELECTIONS CENTER

1825 K Street Nw, Suite 450

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

BILAL AHMED FARUQUI

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Tallahassee, Fl 32399-1050

Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

KAREN ANN BRODEEN

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL - TALLAHASSEE FL

400 S Monroe St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

WILLIAM HENRY STAFFORD, III

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL - PL-01 - TALLAHASSEE FL

400 S Monroe St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

ASHLEY E DAVIS

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE

Ra Gray Building, 500 South Bronough Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE

500 S Bronough Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

COLLEEN E O'BRIEN

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE

500 S Bronough Street, Suite 100

Tallahassee, FL 32399

MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL

Attorney at HOLTZMAN VOGEL BARAN ET AL - TALLAHASSEE FL

5817 Dahlgren Trail

Tallahassee, FL 32312

PHILLIP MICHAEL GORDON

Attorney at HOLTZMAN VOGEL BARAN ET AL - HAYMARKET VA

15405 John Marshall Hwy

Haymarket, VA 20169

FRANK MICHAEL MARI

Attorney at BELL & ROPER PA - ORLANDO FL

2707 E Jefferson St

Orlando, FL 32803

ANDY V BARDOS

Attorney at GRAYROBINSON PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

301 S Bronough St Ste 600

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Other Attorneys

ELIZABETH DESLOGE ELLIS

Attorney at NABORS GIBLIN & NICKERSON PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

1500 Mahan Dr Ste 200

Tallahassee, FL 32308

GREGORY THOMAS STEWART

Attorney at NABORS GIBLIN & NICKERSON PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

1500 Mahan Dr Ste 200

Tallahassee, FL 32308

KIRSTEN H MOOD

Attorney at NABORS GIBLIN & NICKERSON PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

1500 Mahan Dr Ste 200

Tallahassee, FL 32308

BENJAMIN SALZILLO

Attorney at BROWARD COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE - FORT LAUDERDALE FL

115 S Andrews Ave, Ste 423

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

NATHANIEL ADAM KLITSBERG

Attorney at BROWARD COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE - FORT LAUDERDALE FL

115 S Andrews Ave, Ste 423

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#114

#113

#112

#111

#110

#109

#108

#107

#44

#8

#7

#5

#4

#6

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA CENTRAL FLORIDA CHAPTER, PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA FLORIDA CHAPTER, STEPHEN KIRK. AMANDA SEYFANG waiver sent on 8/5/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (BELLAMY, EMMA) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA CENTRAL FLORIDA CHAPTER, PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA FLORIDA CHAPTER, STEPHEN KIRK. MARK ANDERSEN waiver sent on 8/5/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (BELLAMY, EMMA) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA CENTRAL FLORIDA CHAPTER, PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA FLORIDA CHAPTER, STEPHEN KIRK. CHRIS MILTON waiver sent on 8/5/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (BELLAMY, EMMA) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING #110 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. The parties have filed a stipulation of dismissal with respect to Plaintiff Phyllis Resnick. ECF No. 110. The notice is effective without an order.Accordingly, Plaintiff Phyllis Resnick's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. The balance of the case remains pending and thus the case shall remain open. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 08/10/2021. (rcb) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Phyllis Resnick by HARRIET TUBMAN FREEDOM FIGHTERS CORP, STEPHEN KIRK, PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA CENTRAL FLORIDA CHAPTER, PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA FLORIDA CHAPTER, PHYLLIS RESNICK. (AGUILERA, CECILIA) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE J BENDA on behalf of SHIRLEY ANDERSON (BENDA, KYLE) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint by SHIRLEY ANDERSON. (JOUBEN, JON) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) NOTICE of Appearance by JON A JOUBEN on behalf of SHIRLEY ANDERSON (JOUBEN, JON) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA CENTRAL FLORIDA CHAPTER, PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA FLORIDA CHAPTER, STEPHEN KIRK. GERTRUDE WALKER waiver sent on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (BELLAMY, EMMA) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA CENTRAL FLORIDA CHAPTER, PARALYZED VETERANS OF AMERICA FLORIDA CHAPTER, STEPHEN KIRK. MARY JANE ARRINGTON waiver sent on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (BELLAMY, EMMA) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HARRIET TUBMAN FREEDOM FIGHTERS CORP, HEAD COUNT INC. ASHLEY MOODY waiver sent on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (ABUDU, NANCY) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HARRIET TUBMAN FREEDOM FIGHTERS CORP, HEAD COUNT INC. LAUREL LEE waiver sent on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (ABUDU, NANCY) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER ON MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE. Defendant's motions, ECF Nos. #87 , #49 , #5 , are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; this Court will consolidate NAACP, No.: 4:21cv187, and Harriet Tubman, No.: 21cv242, with League of Women Voters, No. 4:21cv186, for discovery purposes only, and will defer ruling on the question of consolidation for trial until after discovery is completed and all dispositive motions have been ruled on. All parties in each of the three cases must meet for a joint scheduling conference on or before 7/6/2021 and file a corresponding Rule 26 report in League of Women Voters, No.: 4:21cv186, on or before 7/19/2021. Finally, Defendant's motion is DENIED without prejudice as to Florida Rising, No.: 21cv201. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/17/2021. (rcb) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/1/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/2/2021. Discovery due by 10/15/2021. Status Report due by 7/19/2021. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/17/2021. (rcb) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by LAUREL LEE. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified on 6/17/2021 to complete the document title. (kjw) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of LAUREL LEE (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET and Exhibit A. (kjw) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Head Count, Inc.. (ABUDU, NANCY) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Harriet Tubman Freedom Fighters, Corp.. (ABUDU, NANCY) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6134068.), filed by Harriet Tubman Freedom Fighters, Corp., Head Count, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ABUDU, NANCY) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less