This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 16:21:59 (UTC).

Harrell v. BMW of North America LLC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Harrell filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against BMW of North America LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sherri A Lydon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00218

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sherri A Lydon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maurice Harrell

Defendant

BMW of North America LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence B Serbin

Attorney at Jason E Taylor Law Office

Po Box 2688

Hickory, NC 28603

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BMW of North America LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/25/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Orville, Matthew) (Attachment: #1 Memo in Support) Modified on 3/11/2020 to add attachment as provided by filing user (lgib, ). (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BMW of North America LLC (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8896090), filed by Maurice Harrell. (hcic, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by BMW of North America LLC.(Orville, Matthew) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Maurice Harrell.(hcic, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maurice Harrell. BMW of North America LLC served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Serbin, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

6 #1

Memo in Support

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to BMW of North America LLC. Service due by 4/22/2020. (hcic, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by BMW of North America LLC.(Orville, Matthew) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BMW of North America LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/25/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Orville, Matthew) (Attachment: #1 Memo in Support) Modified on 3/11/2020 to add attachment as provided by filing user (lgib, ). (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maurice Harrell. BMW of North America LLC served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Serbin, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to BMW of North America LLC. Service due by 4/22/2020. (hcic, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Maurice Harrell.(hcic, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BMW of North America LLC (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8896090), filed by Maurice Harrell. (hcic, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less