This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2019 at 07:50:52 (UTC).

Harrell et al v. AIG Property Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 Harrell filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AIG Property Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael T. Parker and Keith Starrett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00089

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

Presiding Judge

Keith Starrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jimmie Harrell

Rose M. Harrell

Defendants

XYZ Insurance Companies 1-4

AIG Property Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles E. Lawrence, Jr.

Attorney at LAWRENCE LAW OFFICE, PLLC

606 John Street, P. O. Box 1624 (39403)

Hattiesburg, MS 39401

Defendant Attorney

Christina May Bolin

Attorney at CHRISTINA & SMALL, LLP - Daphne

1Timber Way, Suite 101

Daphne, AL 36527

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 8/16/19. (KPM) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#3

(#3) AIGPCC'S ANSWER to Complaint by AIG Property Casualty Company.(Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by AIG Property Casualty Company (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

1 #5

Attachment 2 - Attachment to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #4

Attachment 1 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AIG Property Casualty Company from Circuit Court of Forrest County, MS, case number W19-0018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-400239) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment 1 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Attachment 2 - Attachment to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(LDR) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 8/16/19. (KPM) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AIGPCC'S ANSWER to Complaint by AIG Property Casualty Company.(Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2 : Attorney is advised that when a more specific event under the category "Notices" is available, it should be used in place of "Notice (Other)". This document should have been docketed as Notice of Disclosure. It is not necessary to refile. (LDR) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by AIG Property Casualty Company (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AIG Property Casualty Company from Circuit Court of Forrest County, MS, case number W19-0018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-400239) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment 1 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Attachment 2 - Attachment to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(LDR) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less