This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2021 at 07:18:37 (UTC).

Harper v. Weston Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Harper filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Weston Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip G. Reinhard and Margaret J. Schneider. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-50337

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip G. Reinhard

Referral Judge

Margaret J. Schneider

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dana Harper

Defendants

Weston Solutions, Inc.

Antea USA, Inc.

Central Wire Industries, Ltd.

CWI Holding, Inc.

Lincoln Electric Holdings, Inc.

USI Holding, Inc.

Arcelormittal International America, LLC

Arcelormittal USA Foundation, Inc.

Cleveland-Cliffs Steel, LLC

Gerry Roup

Henry Lopes

Richard Perlick

Richard Gustafson

Mike Grunthaner

David Plecner

Victor Polard

Carl Reed

Terry Taminausksas

Tom Hanewald

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Raymond Grieco

Attorney at Romanucci & Blandin

321 N Clark St.Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60654

Stephan David Blandin

Attorney at Romanucci & Blandin

321 North Clark Streetsuite 900

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel K. Cray

Attorney at Cray Huber Horstman Heil & VanAusdal LLC

303 West Madison Streetsuite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

Maura Yusof

Attorney at CRAY HUBER HORSTMAN HEIL & VanAUSDAL LLC

330 West Madison Streetsuite 4200

Chicago, IL 60606

Ryan Leibforth

Attorney at Patton & Ryan, LLC

330 N. Wabash Avenuesuite 3800

Chicago, IL 60611

David F. Ryan

Attorney at Patton & Ryan, LLC

330 North Wabash Avenue#3800

Chicago, IL 60611

John William Patton, Jr.

Attorney at Patton & Ryan, LLC

330 N. Wabash Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60611

David A. Kanter

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell

330 North Wabashsuite 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

Eric Jonathan Skwiat

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell, Llp

330 N Wabashsuite 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

Stephen P Ellenbecker

Attorney at Johnson & Bell, Ltd

33 W. Monroesuite 2700

Chicago, IL 60603

Other Attorneys

Michael J McGowan

Attorney at SmithAmundsen LLC

150 North Michigan Avenuesuite 3300

Chicago, IL 60601

Craig Andrew Cappas

Attorney at Smith Amundsen, L.L.C.

150 North Michigan Avenuesuite 3300

Chicago, IL 60601

Jeffrey Irving Young

Attorney at SmithAmundsen LLC

150 N. Michigan Avenuesuite 3300

Chicago, IL 60601

Michael John Kanute

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

311 S. Wacker Drivesuite 4400

Chicago, IL 60606

Ruben Ignacio Gonzalez

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

311 S. Wacker Drivesuite 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael Rachlis

Attorney at Rachlis Duff & Peel, LLC

542 South Dearbornsuite 900

Chicago, IL 60605

Kevin Buckley Duff

Attorney at Rachlis Duff & Peel, LLC

542 South Dearborn Streetsuite 900

Chicago, IL 60605

 

Court Documents

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#27

#24

21 #4

Exhibit D

#21

#5

#4

#2

1 #5

Exhibit E-affidavit of Maura Yusof

1 #4

Exhibit D-Antea consent

1 #3

Exhibit C-McHenry NOF of Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit B-McHenry electronic file & docket

1 #1

Exhibit A-Plf's Complaint, JD & Aff of Damages

#1

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nortek Global HVAC, LLC by Michael John Kanute (Kanute, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nortek Global HVAC, LLC by Ruben Ignacio Gonzalez (Gonzalez, Ruben) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Viking Chemical Company by Jeffrey Irving Young (Young, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Viking Chemical Company by Craig Andrew Cappas (Cappas, Craig) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Viking Chemical Company by Michael J McGowan (McGowan, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Until After Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #27 , is granted. The Court applies this ruling to ALL Defendants. ALL Defendants are to respond to Plaintiff's complaint 21 days after resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Additionally, as to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #21 , ALL Defendants are directed to respond to the Motion to Remand 21 days after the last of the Defendants are served and appear. The Court draws the parties' attention to minute entry #24 , granting Plaintiff until 12/01/21 to effectuate service on the unserved defendants. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION by Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company, LP for extension of time Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Until After Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Rachlis, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company, LP by Michael Rachlis (Rachlis, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company, LP by Kevin Buckley Duff (Duff, Kevin) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Her Deadline for Serving Process #20 , is granted. Plaintiff has until 12/01/21 to effectuate service on the remaining Defendants. Plaintiff is directed to submit a status report by 12/08/21 updating the Court on the status of service of the remaining Defendants. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file motion for remand by 09/29/21 and in excess of 15 pages #8 , is granted. Plaintiff has until 09/29/21 to file her motion for remand. The motion shall not exceed 20 pages. The Court will set further briefing on the motion for remand once the motion is filed. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiff Dana Harper for leave to file Her Motion to Remand on or by September 29, 2021 and For Leave to File Her Motion in Excess of 15 pages (unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grieco, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Antea USA, Inc., Arcelormittal International America, LLC, Arcelormittal USA Foundation, Inc., Autumnwood Esh Consultants, LLC, Broan-Nutone, LLC, CWI Holding, Inc., Central Wire Industries, Ltd., Cleveland-Cliffs Steel, LLC, Jean-Claude Couasnon, Thiery Cremailh, Gunnar K Gilberg, Mike Grunthaner, Richard Gustafson, Tom Hanewald, Lincoln Electric Holdings, Inc., Henry Lopes, Matrix Environmental Incorporated, Melrose Industries PLC, Nortek Global HVAC, LLC, Richard Perlick, David Plecner, Victor Polard, Rangaire Manufacturing Company, LP, Carl Reed, Gerry Roup, Terry Taminausksas, John W. Thorsen, USI Holding, Inc., Viking Chemical Company, Weston Solutions, Inc., Jack Zuharich. (ng, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INTRA district transfer from the Eastern Division 21cv4610. (jp, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DIVISIONAL TRANSFER Notice. Case transferred to Western Division - Rockford. (ph, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (ph, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weston Solutions, Inc. by Maura Yusof (Yusof, Maura) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weston Solutions, Inc. by Daniel K. Cray (Cray, Daniel) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cray, Daniel) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from McHenry County, case number (21LA162) filed by Weston Solutions, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18613756. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plf's Complaint, JD & Aff of Damages, #2 Exhibit B-McHenry electronic file & docket, #3 Exhibit C-McHenry NOF of Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D-Antea consent, #5 Exhibit E-affidavit of Maura Yusof)(Cray, Daniel) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Central Wire Industries, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Weston Solutions Inc. is a litigant