This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2022 at 07:44:00 (UTC).

Harper v. Schneider National Carriers, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 Harper filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Schneider National Carriers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01568

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Harper

Town & Country, MO 63017

Defendant

Schneider National Carriers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin Adam Collins

Attorney at Collins Law Firm LLC

13321 North Outer 40 Rd., Suite 800

Chesterfield, MO 63017

Defendant Attorneys

Misty L Edwards

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP - Belleville

525 West Main Street, Suite 300

Belleville, IL 62220

Kurt E. Reitz

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP - Belleville

525 West Main Street, Suite 300

Belleville, IL 62220

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Adam Collins on behalf of Gary Harper (Collins, Justin) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#10

(#10) STRICKEN First MOTION to Take Deposition from Nathan Narcisse by Gary Harper. (Collins, Justin) Modified on 8/22/2022 (kdw). (Entered: 08/21/2022)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National Carriers, Inc. for Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Reitz, Kurt) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Notice to Circuit Clerk from St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 21-L-0681, filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc..(Reitz, Kurt) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Reitz, Kurt) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Misty L Edwards on behalf of Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Edwards, Misty) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

4 #1

Exhibit FSC Notice of Removal and Exhibits

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National Carriers Inc for Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Reitz, Kurt) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt E. Reitz on behalf of Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Reitz, Kurt) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #10 Motion to Take Deposition filed by Gary Harper. Filing of Disclosure and Discovery. Interrogatories under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 33 and the answers thereto, requests for production or inspection under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 34, and depositions under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 30 and 31 shall be served upon other counsel or parties but shall not be filed with the court. This includes notice of service of discovery documents. The party responsible for service of the discovery material shall retain the original and become the custodian thereof.(kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Adam Collins on behalf of Gary Harper (Collins, Justin) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF ACTION re #10 Motion to Take Deposition filed by Gary Harper. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Collins does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STRICKEN First MOTION to Take Deposition from Nathan Narcisse by Gary Harper. (Collins, Justin) Modified on 8/22/2022 (kdw). (Entered: 08/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National Carriers, Inc. for Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Reitz, Kurt) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 22-1568-SMY. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kdw) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Notice to Circuit Clerk from St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 21-L-0681, filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc..(Reitz, Kurt) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Reitz, Kurt) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Misty L Edwards on behalf of Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Edwards, Misty) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 21-L-0681, filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FSC Notice of Removal and Exhibits)(Reitz, Kurt) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National Carriers Inc for Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Reitz, Kurt) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt E. Reitz on behalf of Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Reitz, Kurt) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 21-L-0681 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4836100), filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Reitz, Kurt) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt E. Reitz