This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2020 at 14:53:48 (UTC).

Harper v. Purple Innovation Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 Harper filed an Other lawsuit against Purple Innovation Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan P. Watters. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Harper

Defendant

Purple Innovation Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colin M. Gerstner

Attorney at GERSTNER ADAM LAW, PLLC

2702 Montana Ave., Suite 201B, Po Box 2359

Billings, MT 59103

Paul W. Adam

Attorney at GERSTNER ADAM LAW, PLLC

2702 Montana Ave., Suite 201B, Po Box 2359

Billings, MT 59103

Philip Fraietta

Attorney at BURSOR & FISHER, P.A.

888 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorney

Trevor D. Everett

Attorney at DURHAM JONES & PINEGAR

111 Main Street, Suite 2400

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary pretrial conference set for 6/8/2020 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/14/2020. (EMH) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Scheduling Order P

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #4 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 9) Trevor D. Everett appearing for Defendant Purple Innovation Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Everett, Trevor) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#12

(#12) CM ECF Registration Letter mailed to PHV attorney Philip Fraietta. (EMH) Modified on 5/12/2020 Mailed with copy of Order(EMH). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #7 Motion to admit Philip Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/11/2020. (S.N contacted to add attorney to database) (EMH) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

10 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Casey McGarvey

#10

(#10) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Purple Innovation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Casey McGarvey) (Everett, Trevor) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Trevor D. Everett appearing for Defendant Purple Innovation Inc. (Everett, Trevor) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor D. Everett on behalf of Purple Innovation Inc. (Everett, Trevor) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Affidavit of Philip Fraietta

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION Philip L. Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2479154.) Colin M. Gerstner appearing for Plaintiff Mary Harper (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip Fraietta, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Gerstner, Colin) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Purple Innovation Inc. answer due 5/11/2020. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/29/2020. (EMH) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading Colin M. Gerstner appearing for Plaintiff Mary Harper (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gerstner, Colin) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#4

(#4) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/2/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/26/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/2/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 01:30 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/7/2020. (EMH) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Harper. Purple Innovation Inc. served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Gerstner, Colin) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Purple Innovation Inc.(Original with one copy mailed to attorney) (AMC) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary pretrial conference set for 6/8/2020 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/14/2020. (EMH) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #4 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 9) Trevor D. Everett appearing for Defendant Purple Innovation Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Everett, Trevor) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketRemark: PHV attorney Phillip Fraietta is now a registered with CM ECF and can receive electronic notices in this case. (EMH) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CM ECF Registration Letter mailed to PHV attorney Philip Fraietta. (EMH) Modified on 5/12/2020 Mailed with copy of Order(EMH). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #7 Motion to admit Philip Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/11/2020. (S.N contacted to add attorney to database) (EMH) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Purple Innovation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Casey McGarvey) (Everett, Trevor) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Trevor D. Everett appearing for Defendant Purple Innovation Inc. (Everett, Trevor) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor D. Everett on behalf of Purple Innovation Inc. (Everett, Trevor) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION Philip L. Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2479154.) Colin M. Gerstner appearing for Plaintiff Mary Harper (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip Fraietta, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Gerstner, Colin) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Purple Innovation Inc. answer due 5/11/2020. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/29/2020. (EMH) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading Colin M. Gerstner appearing for Plaintiff Mary Harper (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gerstner, Colin) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/2/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/26/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/2/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 01:30 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/7/2020. (EMH) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Harper. Purple Innovation Inc. served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Gerstner, Colin) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Purple Innovation Inc.(Original with one copy mailed to attorney) (AMC) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2464645. (EMH) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Purple Innovation Inc. filed by Mary Harper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less