This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/12/2021 at 16:12:11 (UTC).

Harper v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Harper filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Auto-Owners Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Billy Roy Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00298

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Billy Roy Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clint Harper

Defendant

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Eugene Hartness

Attorney at Brad Hendricks Law Firm

500 Pleasant Valley Drive, Suite C

Little Rock, AR 72227

Defendant Attorney

Jason A. Lee

Attorney at Gill Ragon Owen P.A.

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 3800

Little Rock, AR 72201-2413

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/22/2021. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/6/2021. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 389 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 4/14/21. (mmb) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (jbh) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Clint Harper. (jbh) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company from Grant County Circuit Court, case number 27CV-21-00024. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT081678. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/22/2021. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/6/2021. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 389 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 4/14/21. (mmb) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (jbh) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Clint Harper. (jbh) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company from Grant County Circuit Court, case number 27CV-21-00024. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT081678. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason A. Lee