This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:44:06 (UTC).

Haroun v. ThoughtWorks, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Haroun filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ThoughtWorks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Majdi Haroun

Defendants

Nathan Elsberry

ThoughtWorks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hilary Joy Orzick

Attorney at Wigdor LLP

85 Fifth Avenue, 5Th Fl.

New York, NY 10003

Michael John Willemin

Attorney at Wigdor LLP

85 Fifth Avenue, 5Th Fl.

New York, NY 10003

Defendant Attorney

Sean A Malley

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C. (NYC)

900 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hilary Joy Orzick on behalf of Majdi Haroun. (Orzick, Hilary) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER: This case has been randomly reassigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for May 11, 2020 shall take place on that date and at that time in Courtroom 15C of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, as further set forth in this order, as further set forth in this order. (Initial Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/2/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Willemin, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Nathan Elsberry(in his professional capacities), Nathan Elsberry(in his individual capacities), ThoughtWorks, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18432412)Document filed by Majdi Haroun.(Willemin, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/13/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nathan Elsberry(in his professional capacities), Nathan Elsberry(in his individual capacities), ThoughtWorks, Inc.. (pc) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/7/2020) (pc). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/10/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (mf) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#8

(#8) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ThoughtWorks, Inc..(Malley, Sean) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#7

(#7) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/13/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ThoughtWorks, Inc. and Nathan Elsberry, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Majdi Haroun. (Willemin, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nathan Elsberry(in his professional capacities), Nathan Elsberry(in his individual capacities), ThoughtWorks, Inc..(Malley, Sean) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: This case has been randomly reassigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for May 11, 2020 shall take place on that date and at that time in Courtroom 15C of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, as further set forth in this order, as further set forth in this order. (Initial Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/2/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 3/9/2020..(ms) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/10/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (mf) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nathan Elsberry(in his professional capacities), Nathan Elsberry(in his individual capacities), ThoughtWorks, Inc..(Malley, Sean) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ThoughtWorks, Inc..(Malley, Sean) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/13/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/13/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nathan Elsberry(in his professional capacities), Nathan Elsberry(in his individual capacities), ThoughtWorks, Inc.. (pc) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/7/2020) (pc). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hilary Joy Orzick on behalf of Majdi Haroun. (Orzick, Hilary) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ThoughtWorks, Inc. and Nathan Elsberry, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Majdi Haroun. (Willemin, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Willemin, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nathan Elsberry(in his professional capacities), Nathan Elsberry(in his individual capacities), ThoughtWorks, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18432412)Document filed by Majdi Haroun.(Willemin, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.