Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2019 at 07:40:15 (UTC).

Harold Pick v. James A. Kay, et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 Harold Pick filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against James A Kay. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederick F. Mumm, Dean D. Pregerson and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07137

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

Presiding Judges

Dean D. Pregerson

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Harold Pick

Wireless US, LC

Jay Francis

Defendants

Motorola Solutions, Inc.

James A. Kay

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Lucky s Two-Way Radios, Inc.

Peter E. Carlson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Levi Lesches

Attorney at Lesches Law

5757 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 535

Los Angeles, CA 90036

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Pick, Jay Francis, Wireless US, LC, upon Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp., Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#17

(#17) 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #12 as to Defendants Motorola Solutions, Inc., James A. Kay, Lucky's Two-Way Radios, Inc., Peter E. Carlson. (gk) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#16

(#16) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Plaintiffs Jay Francis, Harold Pick, Wireless US, LC. (Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: First Amended Complaint #12 . The following error(s) was found: Summons request made as to defendants lists James A. Kay, Jr. to be served on Attachment No. 2. The First Amended Complaint names defendant as James A. Kay. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#13

(#13) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Plaintiffs Jay Francis, Harold Pick, Wireless US, LC. (Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#12

(#12) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Wireless US, LC, Peter E. Carlson, Jay Francis amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick(Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#11

(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#10

(#10) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 19-03 filed on 9/13/2019. The case number will now read CV 19-7137-DMG (FFMx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07137 DMG(FFMx). (rn) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge John F. Walter, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:04-cv-02655 JFW(Ex) (rn) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc. (shb) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick, identifying Harold Pick. (Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 08/18/2019)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick. (Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 08/18/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24273283 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Levi Lesches added to party Harold Pick(pty:pla))(Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Pick, Jay Francis, Wireless US, LC, upon Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp., Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #12 as to Defendants Motorola Solutions, Inc., James A. Kay, Lucky's Two-Way Radios, Inc., Peter E. Carlson. (gk) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Plaintiffs Jay Francis, Harold Pick, Wireless US, LC. (Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: First Amended Complaint #12 . The following error(s) was found: Summons request made as to defendants lists James A. Kay, Jr. to be served on Attachment No. 2. The First Amended Complaint names defendant as James A. Kay. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Plaintiffs Jay Francis, Harold Pick, Wireless US, LC. (Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Wireless US, LC, Peter E. Carlson, Jay Francis amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick(Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 19-03 filed on 9/13/2019. The case number will now read CV 19-7137-DMG (FFMx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07137 DMG(FFMx). (rn) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge John F. Walter, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:04-cv-02655 JFW(Ex) (rn) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc. (shb) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick, identifying Harold Pick. (Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 08/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick. (Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 08/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24273283 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Levi Lesches added to party Harold Pick(pty:pla))(Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LUCKY'S TWO-WAY RADIOS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Motorola Solutions Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Levi Lesches