This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2021 at 08:16:09 (UTC).

Harnois v. Massachusetts Institute of Technology et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 Harnois filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Massachusetts Institute of Technology. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard G. Stearns and Indira Talwani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10236

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Richard G. Stearns

Indira Talwani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pro Se Party John L. Harnois

Warren, RI 02885

Defendants

Liberty Schilpp

Massachusetts Institute of Technology

Laela Sayigh

Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution

Alessandro Bocconcelli

Michael Moore

Ashley Weston

Interested Parties

Deborah Majewski

Cynthia Cummings

Gavin Fay

Mark Fuller

John Buck

David Gomes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher M. Markey

Attorney at Markey & Gauvin

555 Pleasant Street, Suite 5A

New Bedford, MA 02740

Michael K. Murray

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, LLP

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Tucker David DeVoe

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Roberto M. Braceras

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, LLP

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Interested Party Attorney

Mark A. Johnson

Attorney at University of Massachusetts

333 South Street, 4Th Floor

Shrewsbury, MA 01545

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE by John L. Harnois re 36 Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, Notice to Amend Complaint per Rule 15(a)(1)(B) (Harnois, John) (Entered: 04/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) DECLARATION re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore, Laela Sayigh, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Murray, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MEMORANDUM in Support re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore, Laela Sayigh, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution. (Braceras, Roberto) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore, Laela Sayigh, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution.(Braceras, Roberto) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE by John L. Harnois re #32 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Deadlines Related to Subpoenas Duces Tecum, #33 Memorandum in Support of Motion, of withdrawal of discovery requests and initial disclosures (Harnois, John) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) by Liberty Schilpp, Ashley Weston. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Christopher Markey, #2 Exhibit List of Litigation, #3 Certificate of Service)(Markey, Christopher) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ELECTRONIC NOTICE: Scheduling Conference & Motion Hearing regarding pending motions #30 , #32 set 5/3/2021 02:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion to Change Due Dates to Respond or Answer for Defendants Ashley Weston and Liberty Schilpp #28 . Plaintiff asserts that he mailed notice of the lawsuit and waiver forms to Defendants Weston and Schilpp on February 13, 2021; that on February 26, 2021, he was advised by Attorney Markey that Attorney Markey represented Defendants Schilpp and Weston and would waive service on behalf of his clients; that on March 16, 2021, Plaintiff conducted a Rule 26(f) conference with counsel but objected to Attorney Markey's participation because Attorney Markey had not returned the waiver of service forms; and that later on that same date, Attorney Markey filed executed waiver of service forms. Mem. 1-2 #29 . Plaintiff reports further that on March 17, 2021, he nonetheless paid a New Bedford Sheriff to serve Markey on behalf of his clients. Id. at 3. Plaintiff now asks the court "to change the due dates to respond or answer per Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 for Defendants Liberty Schilpp and Ashley Weston from April 19, 2019 [sic] to April 7, 2021." Id. at 1. He also asks the court to sanction Defendants $71.93 per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(d)(2). Id.Given that Defendants did not file the waiver of service on March 15, 2021, Plaintiff was entitled to serve a subpoena with a response date 21 days thereafter. Accordingly, Defendants' time to file a responsive pleading is April 7, 2021. In light of Defendants' filing of the waiver on March 16, 2021, however, the court will grant an extension of the April 7, 2021 deadline if Defendants so request.Plaintiff's request for the cost of service, however, is DENIED, for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 1. That Rule requires all parties to employ the rules of civil procedure "to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding." Plaintiff's actions in hiring a Sheriff to serve the subpoenas after the waiver forms were filed and burdening the court with this motion violate Rule 1. Further violations of Rule 1 are subject to sanctions. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER regarding Defendants' Motion for Protective Order to Stay Discovery Pending Disposition of Motions to Dismiss #30 and University Personnel's Motion for Protective Order Staying Deadlines #32 . Plaintiff shall file any opposition to the motions no later than April 16, 2021. All discovery in this litigation, including initial disclosures, is stayed pending further order of the court. All deadlines for responding or objecting to subpoenas deuces tecum and for filing motions to quash or modify are stayed pending further order of the court. The clerk shall reset the 4/26/2021 scheduling conference together with a hearing on the pending motions #30 , #32 . (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docket(#35) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: At the upcoming scheduling conference, the court will set case deadlines, including for initial disclosures and completion of fact discovery. Although parties may serve initial disclosures and requests for written discovery in advance of such deadlines, no responses shall be due until the later of: (a) 30 days after the party requesting discovery has served initial disclosures; or (b) 30 days after the deadline set by the court for initial disclosures. No notices of depositions shall be served prior to the scheduling conference. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendant Massachusetts Institute of Technology by John L. Harnois. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed Massachusetts Institute of Technology served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filing fee/payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 1BST083826 for #1 Complaint,, (Barbosa, Nilsa) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #2 Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se. The court grants permission on the condition that the plaintiff satisfies all applicable training and other requirements for pro se litigants as stated in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Page 5. The plaintiff is directed to complete the registration form accessible at https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/ecfreg.html (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Indira Talwani added. Judge Richard G. Stearns no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#5) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiff John Harnois has filed this case as related to 19-10705, another lawsuit previously litigated before Judge Stearns. A case qualifies as related only if "some or all of the parties are the same and if one or more of the following similarities exist also: the cases involve the same or similar claims or defenses; or the cases involve the same property, transaction or event; or the cases involve insurance coverage for the same property, transaction or event; or the cases involve substantially the same questions of fact and law. In addition, two cases, one criminal and one civil, are related if the civil case involves forfeiture of property from a transaction or event which is the subject of a previously filed criminal case, or the civil case seeks enforcement of a restitution order or fine imposed in a previously filed criminal case. This rule shall not apply if more than two years have elapsed since the closing of the previous action." D. Mass. L.R. 40.1 (related civil cases). In fact none of the parties in these two actions are the same, nor are the claims. Accordingly, this case must be redrawn in compliance with L.R. 40.1.(mkz) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by John L. Harnois.(McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alessandro Bocconcelli, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Liberty Schilpp, Massachusetts Institute of Technology , Ashley Weston, Laela Sayigh, Michael Moore, filed by John L. Harnois. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Alessandro Bocconcelli, #2 Proposed Summons Ashley Weston, #3 Proposed Summons Laela Sayigh, #4 Proposed Summons Liberty Schlipp, #5 Proposed Summons Michael Moore, #6 Proposed Summons MIT, #7 Proposed Summons Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Form)(McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution is a litigant

Latest cases where MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Johnson