This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2021 at 10:52:48 (UTC).

Harmony Licensing LLC v. TCL Communication, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 Harmony Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against TCL Communication, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01783

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harmony Licensing LLC

Defendant

TCL Communication, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Andrew S. Curfman

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Harmony Licensing LLC as to TCL Communication, Inc. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 02/25/2021 - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harmony Licensing LLC. TCL Communication, Inc. served on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (sam) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE42,219. (sam) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT- filed with Jury Demand against TCL Communication, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3429703.) - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (ntl) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Harmony Licensing LLC as to TCL Communication, Inc. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 02/25/2021 filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/26/21. (ntl) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 02/25/2021 - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew S. Curfman for Harmony Licensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01782-LPS, 1:20-cv-01783-LPS. (kmd) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harmony Licensing LLC. TCL Communication, Inc. served on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (6 in 1:20-cv-01783-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC, (6 in 1:20-cv-01782-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/8/21. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01782-LPS, 1:20-cv-01783-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01782-LPS, 1:20-cv-01783-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (sam) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE42,219. (sam) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT- filed with Jury Demand against TCL Communication, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3429703.) - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TCL COMMUNICATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Harmony Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong