This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2021 at 09:58:51 (UTC).

Harmony Licensing LLC v. Skyworks Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Harmony Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Skyworks Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01608

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harmony Licensing LLC

Defendant

Skyworks Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Andrew S. Curfman

Defendant Attorney

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 3/24/2021 - filed by Skyworks Solutions, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Skyworks Solutions, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 2/22/2021 - filed by Skyworks Solutions, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Skyworks Solutions, Inc. served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (sam) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE42,219. (sam) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Skyworks Solutions, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3355802.) - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 3/24/2021 - filed by Skyworks Solutions, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Skyworks Solutions, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 2/22/2021 filed by Skyworks Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/17/20. (ntl) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Skyworks Solutions, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 2/22/2021 - filed by Skyworks Solutions, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Skyworks Solutions, Inc. served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew S. Curfman for Harmony Licensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/3/20. (ntl) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (sam) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE42,219. (sam) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Skyworks Solutions, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3355802.) - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong