This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2021 at 08:08:40 (UTC).

Harmony Licensing LLC v. Sagemcom USA LLC

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Harmony Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sagemcom USA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01245

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harmony Licensing LLC

Defendant

Sagemcom USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Andrew S. Curfman

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

List of Related Cases

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Sagemcom USA LLC served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 11/22/2021 - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Harmony Licensing LLC as to Sagemcom USA LLC (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#10

(#10) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ntl) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ntl) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Harmony Licensing LLC, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/4/21. (ntl) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Harmony Licensing LLC as to Sagemcom USA LLC (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 11/22/2021 filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/10/21. (ntl) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 11/22/2021 - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Sagemcom USA LLC served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew S. Curfman for Harmony Licensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01244-LPS, 1:21-cv-01245-LPS, 1:21-cv-01250-LPS(srs) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (6 in 1:21-cv-01244-LPS)(6 in 1:21-cv-01245-LPS)(6 in 1:21-cv-01250-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/2/21. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01244-LPS, 1:21-cv-01245-LPS, 1:21-cv-01250-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01244-LPS, 1:21-cv-01245-LPS, 1:21-cv-01250-LPS(rjb) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sagemcom USA LLC on 8/30/2021. (apk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (apk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE42,219. (apk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Sagemcom USA LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3688395.) - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 List of Related Cases, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harmony Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong