This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2021 at 08:08:16 (UTC).

Harmony Licensing LLC v. Ruby Industrial Technologies LLC

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Harmony Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ruby Industrial Technologies LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John R. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01684

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Harmony Licensing LLC

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Ruby Industrial Technologies LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Andrew S. Curfman

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wernow

1100 Aegis Tower4940 Munson Street, Nw

Canton, OH 44718

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorney

Scot A.L. Hinshaw

Attorney at Niehaus Kalas Hinshaw - Toledo

7150 Granite Circle

Toledo, OH 43617

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-USRE42219

1 #2

Exhibit B-Claim Chart

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons

#2

#3

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#5

(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ruby Industrial Technologies LLC on 9/15/2021, filed on behalf of Harmony Licensing LLC. Related document(s) #4 . (M,TL) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#6

(#6) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against Harmony Licensing LLC filed by Ruby Industrial Technologies LLC. (Hinshaw, Scot) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ruby Industrial Technologies LLC. (Hinshaw, Scot) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#8

(#8) Joint Case Management Notice filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#9

(#9) Reply to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Reply to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint Case Management Notice filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ruby Industrial Technologies LLC. (Hinshaw, Scot) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against Harmony Licensing LLC filed by Ruby Industrial Technologies LLC. (Hinshaw, Scot) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ruby Industrial Technologies LLC on 9/15/2021, filed on behalf of Harmony Licensing LLC. Related document(s) #4 . (M,TL) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Ruby Industrial Technologies LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7020 0090 0001 4429 1971. (M,TL) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketThis action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (M,TL) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Ruby Industrial Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,TL) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketJudge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Ruby Industrial Technologies LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11008685.. Filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USRE42219, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harmony Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scot A. Hinshaw