This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 18:16:05 (UTC).

Harmony Licensing LLC v. Jacs Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Harmony Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Jacs Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00760

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harmony Licensing LLC

Defendant

Jacs Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Andrew S. Curfman

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed by Harmony Licensing LLC -- Case Stayed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/22/21. (ntl) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Complaint to 07/26/21 filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/22/21. (ntl) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Complaint to 07/26/21 - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew S. Curfman for Harmony Licensing LLC and Harmony Licensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00761-LPS, 1:21-cv-00760-LPS(mal) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (6 in 1:21-cv-00760-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC, (6 in 1:21-cv-00761-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/8/21. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00760-LPS, 1:21-cv-00761-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Jacs Solutions, Inc. served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00760-LPS, 1:21-cv-00761-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (myr) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE42,219. (myr) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT filed with Jury Demand against Jacs Solutions, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3624291.) - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harmony Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong