This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2022 at 09:23:38 (UTC).

Harmony Licensing LLC v. Inseego Corp.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Harmony Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Inseego Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01662

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harmony Licensing LLC

Defendant

Inseego Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Andrew S. Curfman

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT - filed with Jury Demand against Inseego Corp. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3749944.) - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Related Cases)(mal) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Related Cases

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE42,219. (mal) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (mal) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Inseego Corp. on 11/24/2021. (mal) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Inseego Corp. served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 02/07/2022 - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 02/07/2022 filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/22/21. (ntl) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 02/07/2022 - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew S. Curfman for Harmony Licensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01659-LPS, 1:21-cv-01660-LPS, 1:21-cv-01661-LPS, 1:21-cv-01662-LPS(srs) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (7 in 1:21-cv-01659-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC, (7 in 1:21-cv-01660-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC, (7 in 1:21-cv-01662-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC, (7 in 1:21-cv-01661-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/8/21. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01659-LPS, 1:21-cv-01660-LPS, 1:21-cv-01661-LPS, 1:21-cv-01662-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Inseego Corp. served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01659-LPS, 1:21-cv-01660-LPS, 1:21-cv-01661-LPS, 1:21-cv-01662-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Inseego Corp. on 11/24/2021. (mal) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (mal) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE42,219. (mal) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT - filed with Jury Demand against Inseego Corp. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3749944.) - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Related Cases)(mal) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Inseego Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Harmony Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong