This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2021 at 10:39:10 (UTC).

Harmony Licensing LLC v. Fortinet, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Harmony Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fortinet, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00445

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harmony Licensing LLC

Defendant

Fortinet, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Andrew S. Curfman

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 07/05/2021 - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 06/04/2021 - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Fortinet, Inc. served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (kmd) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE42,219. (kmd) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Infringement of Patent filed with Jury Demand against Fortinet, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3579940.) - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 07/05/2021 filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/24/21. (ntl) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 07/05/2021 - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 06/04/2021 filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/8/21. (ntl) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 06/04/2021 - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew S. Curfman for Harmony Licensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 21-cv-00445-LPS, 21-cv-00446-LPS (myr) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Fortinet, Inc. served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (6 in 1:21-cv-00446-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC, (6 in 1:21-cv-00445-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/6/21. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00445-LPS, 1:21-cv-00446-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00445-LPS, 1:21-cv-00446-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (kmd) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE42,219. (kmd) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Infringement of Patent filed with Jury Demand against Fortinet, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3579940.) - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fortinet, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Harmony Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong