This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 07:38:09 (UTC).

Harmon v. Wal-Mart Stores East , L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Harmon filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East , L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Callie V. S. Granade and P. Bradley Murray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00014

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Callie V. S. Granade

Referral Judge

P. Bradley Murray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charlene Harmon

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Forrest (Fob) Hood James, IV

Attorney at Fob James Law Firm, LLC

2226 1St Ave S, Suite 105

Birmingham, AL 35233

James Foster

Attorney at Foster Counts LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street, Nw, Suite 2300

Atlanta, GA 30309

Defendant Attorneys

Chad Marchand

Attorney at DeLashmet & Marchand, P.C.

P.O. Box 2047

Mobile, AL 36652

W. Pemble DeLashmet

Attorney at DeLashmet & Marchand, P.C.

P.O. Box 2047

Mobile, AL 36652

Keith B. Franklin

Attorney at DeLashmet & Marchand, PC

462 Dauphin Street

Mobile, AL 36602

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Order STRIKING #13 Notice of Filing Stipulated Protective Order as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 2/10/22. (tot) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#14

(#14) Order on #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 2/10/22. (tot) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#13

(#13) Notice of Filing Stipulated Protective Order filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Marchand, Chad) (STRICKEN ON 2/10/22 - SEE DOC. #15 ) Modified on 2/10/2022 (tot). (Entered: 02/09/2022)

11 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

11 #11

Main Document

#9

(#9) Notice of Filing Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Marchand, Chad) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#8

(#8) Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.; Disclosure Statements Due 2/15/2022. (tot) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

7 #1

Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust (Franklin, Keith) Modified on 2/8/2022 (tot). (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust on 01/20/2022 and 01/24/2022, filed by Charlene Harmon. (James, Forrest (Fob)) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Charlene Harmon (James, Forrest (Fob)) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#2

(#2) Service Notice entered 1/13/2022. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 2/28/2022. (tot) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Order STRIKING #13 Notice of Filing Stipulated Protective Order as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 2/10/22. (tot) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Order on #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 2/10/22. (tot) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #13 Notice of Filing Stipulated Protective Order to Judge Murray. (mab) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Filing Stipulated Protective Order filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Marchand, Chad) (STRICKEN ON 2/10/22 - SEE DOC. #15 ) Modified on 2/10/2022 (tot). (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT-ONLY ORDER, GRANTING #11 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James Zollie Foster. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/9/2022. (mab) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION and APPLICATION for James Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION and APPLICATION for James Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2959213, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Charlene Harmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Foster, James) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Notice of Filing #9 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (APG) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Filing Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Marchand, Chad) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.; Disclosure Statements Due 2/15/2022. (tot) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 2/8/22. (Attachment: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge) (tot) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust (Franklin, Keith) Modified on 2/8/2022 (tot). (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer due from Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., pursuant to FRCP 12(a) - See Doc. #5 . (tot) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust on 01/20/2022 and 01/24/2022, filed by Charlene Harmon. (James, Forrest (Fob)) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Charlene Harmon (James, Forrest (Fob)) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Service Notice entered 1/13/2022. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 2/28/2022. (tot) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2940724, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 4/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (James, Forrest (Fob)) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keith B. Franklin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chad Christopher Marchand