This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2020 at 10:01:58 (UTC).

Harmon v. Uintah Basin Medical Center et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Harmon filed an Other lawsuit against Uintah Basin Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Romero, Jill N. Parrish and Jared C. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00669

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jared C. Bennett

Presiding Judges

Cecilia M. Romero

Jill N. Parrish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin K. Harmon, Jr.

Defendants

Northeastern Counseling Center

Jason S. Beales

Uintah Basin Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ernest James Istook, Jr.

Attorney at HOWARD LEWIS & PETERSEN

120 E 300 N

Provo, UT 84606

D. David Lambert

Attorney at HOWARD LEWIS & PETERSEN

120 E 300 N

Provo, UT 84606

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick C. Burt

Attorney at KIPP & CHRISTIAN

10 Exchange Place Fourth Fl

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2314

Jaryl L. Rencher

Attorney at RENCHER ANJEWIERDEN

460 S 400 E

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Benjamin K. Lusty

Attorney at RENCHER ANJEWIERDEN

460 S 400 E

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss , #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Kevin K. Harmon, Jr. (Istook, Ernest) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order filed by Plaintiff Kevin K. Harmon, Jr (Istook, Ernest) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docket(#24) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/10/20. (ss) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #22 filed by Defendant Northeastern Counseling Center (Burt, Patrick) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/6/20. (ss) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docket(#21) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (alf) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docket(#20) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Jason S. Beales, Uintah Basin Medical Center. (alf) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Istook, Ernest) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Northeastern Counseling Center. (Burt, Patrick) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docket(#17) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Kevin K. Harmon, Jr. (alf) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin K. Harmon, Jr (Istook, Ernest) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin K. Harmon, Jr as to Northeastern Counseling Center served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Istook, Ernest) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin K. Harmon, Jr as to Uintah Basin Medical Center served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Istook, Ernest) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed By agreement Answer due 10/26 Acknowledgment filed by Kevin K. Harmon, Jr.Jason S. Beales served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020; Uintah Basin Medical Center served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Istook, Ernest) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/23/2020. (nl) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Northeastern Counseling Center. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jason S. Beales. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Uintah Basin Medical Center. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT Kevin Kent Harmon, Jr., against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3728575) filed by Kevin K. Harmon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Harmon Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Istook, Ernest) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Kevin K. Harmon, Jr is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick C. Burt(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jaryl L. Rencher