This case was last updated from PACER on 10/25/2019 at 07:55:39 (UTC).

Harmon v. Howell et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 a Prisoner - Prison Condition case was filed by Harmon against Howell in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-01391

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

John E Ott

 

Party Details

Defendants

Pastor Chris Hodges

Sgt. Brown

Sheriff Denis Green

Lt. Wilson

Corizon Health Care

Chief Brown

Ms. Barnes

Lt. Roseman

Deputy Josphua Freeman

Ms. Smith

67 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER DISMISSING CASE that the court ORDERS this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/15/2019. (AHI) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmy Claude Harmon, Jr. (AHI) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is required to pay an initial partial filing fee of $22.16, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/29/2019. (AHI) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to court by Jimmy Claude Harmon, Jr (AHI ) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jimmy Claude Harmon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(AHI) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER DISMISSING CASE that the court ORDERS this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/15/2019. (AHI) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE to court by Jimmy Claude Harmon, Jr (AHI ) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is required to pay an initial partial filing fee of $22.16, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/29/2019. (AHI) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmy Claude Harmon, Jr. (AHI) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jimmy Claude Harmon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(AHI) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.