This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/04/2022 at 10:41:01 (UTC).

Harmon v. American Medical Systems Inc

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Harmon filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas O. Rice. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00338

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas O. Rice

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Harmon

Defendant

American Medical Systems Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick K Fannin

Attorney at Patrick K Fannin Attorney at Law

1312 North Monroe

Spokane, WA 99201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) First MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily with Prejudice by Kimberly Harmon. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Fannin, Patrick) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and causes of action in this matter are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#4

(#4) JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. (BF, Paralegal) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. (BF, Paralegal) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and causes of action in this matter are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) First MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily with Prejudice by Kimberly Harmon. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Fannin, Patrick) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Kimberly Harmon against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3934339) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fannin, Patrick) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick K Fannin