This case was last updated from PACER on 11/07/2020 at 08:40:31 (UTC).

Harman International Industries, Inc. v. JEM Accessories, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 Harman International Industries, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against JEM Accessories, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08222

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harman International Industries, Inc.

Defendant

JEM Accessories, Inc. a New Jersey corporation doing business as Xtreme Cables

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick W Kelly

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John J. Dabney

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

2001 K Street Nw Suite 425 North

Washington, DC 20006

Mary D. Hallerman

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer L.L.P.

2001 K Street Nw Suite 425 North

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey P. Resnick

Attorney at Sherman Silverstein Kohl Rose and Podolsky PA

308 Harper Drive Suite 200

Moorestown, NJ 08057

Lee E. Burrows

Attorney at Law Offices of Lee Burrows APC

46 Corporate Park Suite 110

Irvine, CA 92606

 

Court Documents

27 #1

Declaration Declaration of Elie Chemtob in Further Support of Defendant's M

#27

(#27) REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #19 filed by Defendant JEM Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Elie Chemtob in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Burrows, Lee) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

26 #1

Proposed Order

#26

(#26) First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey P Resnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant JEM Accessories, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 11/4/2020, Receipt No. 28853427) filed by Defendant JEM Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Burrows, Lee) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

24 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of non-Resident Attorney to Appear

19 #3

Supplement Request for Judicial Notice

19 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss

19 #1

Declaration Declaration of Elie Chemtob

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant JEM Accessories, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Elie Chemtob, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice) (Attorney Lee E Burrows added to party JEM Accessories, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Burrows, Lee) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#6

(#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Harman International Industries, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Harman International Industries, Inc.. Related Case(s): 1:20-cv-04984-GHW (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Harman International Industries, Inc., identifying Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Harman International Industries, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Harman International Industries, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant JEM Accessories, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #19 filed by Defendant JEM Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Elie Chemtob in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Burrows, Lee) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey P Resnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant JEM Accessories, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 11/4/2020, Receipt No. 28853427) filed by Defendant JEM Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Burrows, Lee) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey P Resnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant JEM Accessories, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-28853427) #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey P Resnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant JEM Accessories, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-28853427) filed by Defendant JEM Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Burrows, Lee) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #19 filed by Plaintiff Harman International Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hallerman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Attachment 3: Request for Judicial Notice, should have been e-filed as a separate, stand-alone document from the motion In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#20) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On October 14, 2020, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why it should not dismiss this action for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff has filed a response to the Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution on October 16, 2020. The Court deems that response satisfactory, and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant JEM Accessories, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Elie Chemtob, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice) (Attorney Lee E Burrows added to party JEM Accessories, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Burrows, Lee) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before 10/26/2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. Defendant(s) JEM Accessories, Inc. did not answer the complaint, yet Plaintiff(s) have failed to request entry of default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff(s) can satisfy this order by seeking entry of default or by dismissing the complaint. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant JEM Accessories, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Harman International Industries, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Harman International Industries, Inc.. Related Case(s): 1:20-cv-04984-GHW (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Harman International Industries, Inc., identifying Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Harman International Industries, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Harman International Industries, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27988859 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Harman International Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Patrick W Kelly added to party Harman International Industries, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARMAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John J Dabney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick W. Kelly