This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 08:08:32 (UTC).

Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Broan-Nutone, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christian F. Hummel and Mae A. D'Agostino. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00586

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christian F. Hummel

Presiding Judge

Mae A. D'Agostino

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company

Defendant

Broan-Nutone, LLC

Not Classified By Court

James E. Hacker

Troy, NY 12180

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Angelo Capalbo

Attorney at Law Office of Charles F. Harms Jr.

990 Stewart Avenue, Ste 400

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorneys

Hilda R Marinello

Attorney at O'Connor, O'Connor Law Firm - Albany Office

20 Corporate Woods Boulevard

Albany, NY 12211

Dennis A. First

Attorney at O'Connor, O'Connor Law Firm - Albany Office

20 Corporate Woods Boulevard

Albany, NY 12211

Brian P. Krzykowski

Attorney at O'Connor, O'Connor Law Firm - Albany Office

20 Corporate Woods Boulevard

Albany, NY 12211

Not Classified By Court Attorney

James E. Hacker

Attorney at E. Stewart Jones Hacker Murphy, LLP

28 Second Street

Troy, NY 12180

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) APPROVED PROTECTIVE/CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/20/2019. (tab) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#11

(#11) CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT (First, Dennis) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 7/17/2019. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 9/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/19/2019. (tab) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#9

(#9) UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 4 days (jury trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 10/18/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/18/2019. Discovery due by 7/17/2020. Motions to be filed by 9/17/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 9/27/2019. Status Report due by 3/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/19/2019. (tab) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Krzykowski on behalf of Broan-Nutone, LLC (Krzykowski, Brian) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#7

(#7) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (First, Dennis) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. First on behalf of Broan-Nutone, LLC (First, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

5 #1

Declaration

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Marinello, Hilda) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#4

(#4) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Marinello, Hilda) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/11/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT. (jdp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warren County Supreme Court, case number EF2019-66703 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4743539) filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • (#13) STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that James E. Hacker has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Dennis First and Angelo Capalbo. Dated: June 26, 2019(First, Dennis) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) APPROVED PROTECTIVE/CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/20/2019. (tab) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT (First, Dennis) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 7/17/2019. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 9/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/19/2019. (tab) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 4 days (jury trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 10/18/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/18/2019. Discovery due by 7/17/2020. Motions to be filed by 9/17/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 9/27/2019. Status Report due by 3/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/19/2019. (tab) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/18/2019. Appearances by Angelo Capalbo, Esq. for plaintiff (by telephone) and Brian Krzykowski, Esq. for Defendants. Pretrial deadlines are established. A Scheduling Order will be issued. (tab) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Krzykowski on behalf of Broan-Nutone, LLC (Krzykowski, Brian) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (First, Dennis) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. First on behalf of Broan-Nutone, LLC (First, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Marinello, Hilda) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Marinello, Hilda) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/11/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT. (jdp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warren County Supreme Court, case number EF2019-66703 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4743539) filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.