This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2021 at 10:35:51 (UTC).

HARLEY v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA CITY GOVERNMENT et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 HARLEY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA CITY GOVERNMENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03680

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARY HARLEY

Philadelphia, PA 19132

Defendants

CITY OF PHILADELPHIA CITY GOVERNMENT

CITY HALL

MONTGOMERY COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

THE POLICE COMMISSIONER OF PHILADELPHIA OFFICER DANIELLE OUTLAW

ALL POLICE DISTRICT UNIT #2 THRU 39TH DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPLEADING #6 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #5 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL IS DENIED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/2/21.9/2/21 ENTERED. NOT MAILED TO HARLEY. (fdc) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by MARY HARLEY..(fdc, ) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY, THIS CASE IS SUBJECT TO SCREENING AND THE COMPLAINT WILL BE SCREENED IN DUE COURSE. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED NOT TO ISSUE SUMMONSES AT THIS TIME AS THE COMPLAINT IS STILL SUBJECT TO THE COURT'S SCREENING. THE TIME TO SERVE PROCESS IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO THE DATE 90 DAYS FOLLOWING THE ISSUANCE OF SUMMONSES BY THE CLERK OF COURT AFTER SCREENING IS COMPLETE, IN THE EVENT THIS CASE, OR ANY PORTION THEREOF, IS NOT DISMISSED AT THE SCREENING STAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/25/21.8/26/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketPLEADING #3 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL ) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by MARY HARLEY. (bw, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against ALL POLICE DISTRICT UNIT #2 THRU 39TH DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA, CITY HALL, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA CITY GOVERNMENT, MONTGOMERY COUNTY DISTRICT COURT, THE POLICE COMMISSIONER OF PHILADELPHIA OFFICER DANIELLE OUTLAW, filed by MARY HARLEY.(bw, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MARY HARLEY..(bw, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY HALL is a litigant