This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2019 at 08:54:47 (UTC).

Hargrove v. Dickerson et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Hargrove filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Dickerson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher L. Ray and R. Stan Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00228

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

Presiding Judge

R. Stan Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Hargrove

Defendants

Christopher Dickerson

Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan David Tucker

Attorney at Alan D. Tucker, PC

#9 St. Andrews Court, Suite 201

Brunswick, GA 31520

Defendant Attorneys

John D. Harvey

Attorney at Bouhan Falligant, LLP

One West Park Avenue, P.O. Box 2139

Savannah, GA 31402-2139

Lucas Drayton Bradley

Attorney at Bouhan Falligant, LLP

One West Park Avenue, P.O. Box 2139

Savannah, GA 31402-2139

 

Court Documents

#2

#11

10 #1

Amended Signature Page

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

3 #1

Corrected PDF

#4

#3

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Supplement

1 #2

Affidavit Christopher Dickerson

1 #1

Exhibit State Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2019. Discovery due by 2/24/2020. Motions due by 3/25/2020. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/6/2019. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/6/2020. Status Report due by 3/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/29/19. (jrb) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bradley, Lucas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2019: #1 Amended Signature Page) (evk). (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.. (Harvey, John) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc., Christopher Dickerson. (Harvey, John) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc., Christopher Dickerson identifying Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Harvey, John) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Christopher Dickerson.(Harvey, John) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc..(Harvey, John) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Motions Pending by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc., Christopher Dickerson. (Harvey, John) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance/Pro Hac Vice Motion due by 9/22/2019. Notice of Compliance due by 9/22/2019. (loh) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #1 Corrected PDF) (evk). (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/12/19. (loh) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc., Christopher Dickerson from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV19-01417. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2680821), filed by Christopher Hargrove. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Complaint, #2 Affidavit Christopher Dickerson, #3 Supplement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COCA-COLA BOTTLING COMPANY UNITED INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lucas Drayton Bradley