This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/09/2021 at 08:50:26 (UTC).

HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC. v. PRESIDIA GENERAL CONTRACTING INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PRESIDIA GENERAL CONTRACTING INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are LORETTA C. BIGGS and L. PATRICK AULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00628

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LORETTA C. BIGGS

Referral Judge

L. PATRICK AULD

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Harford Mutual Insurance Group, Inc.

Defendants

Presidia General Contracting Inc.

HDI Global Specialty SE

Counter Claimant and Defendant

HDI Global Specialty SE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

MEGAN N. SILVER

WILLIAM A. BULFER

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

JEFFREY S. SOUTHERLAND

BENJAMIN P. HINTZE

J. NATHAN DUGGINS, III

WILLIAM W. SILVERMAN

 

Court Documents

20 #3

Exhibit Harford Denial

20 #2

Exhibit Tender From Presidia

20 #1

Exhibit Presidia Insurance Policy

#20

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#19

#18

16 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support

#16

4 #1

Summons - HDI Global Specialty SE

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint , Counterclaim against Harford Mutual Insurance Company against by HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Presidia Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit Tender From Presidia, #3 Exhibit Harford Denial)(SILVERMAN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #19 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant PRESIDIA GENERAL CONTRACTING INC. shall answer or otherwise respond within seven (7) days of the Court's ruling on #16 Motion to Dismiss. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/06/2021. (AULD, L.) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred: RE: #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by PRESIDIA GENERAL CONTRACTING INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SOUTHERLAND, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE by HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC. re #17 Memorandum Certificate of Word Count (SILVER, MEGAN) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC. re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC.. (SILVER, MEGAN) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss by HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support)(SILVER, MEGAN) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE. (SILVERMAN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE. (SILVERMAN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM W. SILVERMAN on behalf of Defendant HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE (SILVERMAN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail Return Receipt Requested as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service to Presidia, #2 Exhibit Service to HDI Global)(SILVER, MEGAN) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MEGAN N. SILVER on behalf of Plaintiff HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC. (SILVER, MEGAN) Modified on 8/11/2021 to mark filed in error - Duplicate of pleading 3. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM A. BULFER on behalf of Plaintiff HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC. (BULFER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to PRESIDIA GENERAL CONTRACTING INC., HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE. (Attachments: #1 Summons - HDI Global Specialty SE) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MEGAN NI. SILVER on behalf of Plaintiff HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC. (SILVER, MEGAN) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC. (SILVER, MEGAN) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3109643), filed by HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (SILVER, MEGAN) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less