This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:45:20 (UTC).

Harford Mutual Insurance Company v. Streamline Developers, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Harford Mutual Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Streamline Developers, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00008

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Claimants and Counter Claimants

Streamline Developers, LLC

Jordan Maroules

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Builders Mutual Insurance Company

Leachman Stoller Home Plan Design, LLC

Nancy Stoller

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Builders Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

William A. Bulfer

Daniel Strong

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David S. Coats

Matthew Allen Lawson Anderson

Heather Graham Connor

James C. White

Jonathan Teal Dickerson

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Allen Lawson Anderson

Heather Graham Connor

 

Court Documents

34 #5

Exhibit D - March 8, 2022 Builders Mutual Denial Letter

34 #4

Exhibit C - October 27, 2021 Builders Mutual ROR Letter

34 #3

Exhibit B - December 9, 2021 Auto-Owners Denial Letter

34 #2

Exhibit A - August 12, 2021 HMIC ROR Letter

34 #1

Index to Exhibits

#34

(#34) ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Builders Mutual Insurance Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Harford Mutual Insurance Company by Jordan Maroules, Streamline Developers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - August 12, 2021 HMIC ROR Letter, #3 Exhibit B - December 9, 2021 Auto-Owners Denial Letter, #4 Exhibit C - October 27, 2021 Builders Mutual ROR Letter, #5 Exhibit D - March 8, 2022 Builders Mutual Denial Letter) (Coats, David) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

24 #2

Exhibit EX B - MSJ Order 4:20-cv-134

24 #1

Exhibit EX A - First Amended Complaint 4:20-cv-134

#24

(#34) ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Builders Mutual Insurance Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Harford Mutual Insurance Company by Jordan Maroules, Streamline Developers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - August 12, 2021 HMIC ROR Letter, #3 Exhibit B - December 9, 2021 Auto-Owners Denial Letter, #4 Exhibit C - October 27, 2021 Builders Mutual ROR Letter, #5 Exhibit D - March 8, 2022 Builders Mutual Denial Letter) (Coats, David) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice filed by Harford Mutual Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint, Summons - Streamline Developers. (Bulfer, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#4

(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Harford Mutual Insurance Company (Bulfer, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by William A. Bulfer on behalf of Harford Mutual Insurance Company. (Bulfer, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice filed by Harford Mutual Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (Bulfer, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit EX D - Policy Harford Mutual

1 #3

Exhibit EX C- Policy - Auto-Owners

1 #2

Exhibit EX B - Policy - Builders Mutual

1 #1

Exhibit EX A - First Amended Complaint

#1

(#6) Notice filed by Harford Mutual Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint, Summons - Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Bulfer, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Builders Mutual Insurance Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Harford Mutual Insurance Company by Jordan Maroules, Streamline Developers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - August 12, 2021 HMIC ROR Letter, #3 Exhibit B - December 9, 2021 Auto-Owners Denial Letter, #4 Exhibit C - October 27, 2021 Builders Mutual ROR Letter, #5 Exhibit D - March 8, 2022 Builders Mutual Denial Letter) (Coats, David) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Financial Disclosure Statement by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Anderson, Matthew) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Memorandum in Support regarding #31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Anderson, Matthew) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Anderson, Matthew) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Financial Disclosure Statement by Streamline Developers, LLC (Coats, David) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Financial Disclosure Statement by Jordan Maroules (Coats, David) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Notice of Appearance filed by David S. Coats on behalf of Jordan Maroules, Streamline Developers, LLC. (Coats, David) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketREMINDER TO COUNSEL. Pursuant to Judge Boyle's #Practice Preferences located on the court's website, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of all documents over 20 pages, by mailing or delivering to the clerk's office in Raleigh. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Financial Disclosure Statement by Builders Mutual Insurance Company (Connor, Heather) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Memorandum in Support regarding #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Connor, Heather) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice filed by Harford Mutual Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint, Summons - Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Bulfer, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice filed by Harford Mutual Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint, Summons - Streamline Developers. (Bulfer, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Harford Mutual Insurance Company (Bulfer, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by William A. Bulfer on behalf of Harford Mutual Insurance Company. (Bulfer, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice filed by Harford Mutual Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (Bulfer, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Harford Mutual Insurance Company. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #1 Complaint - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief against HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6398363.), filed by HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit EX B - Policy - Builders Mutual, #3 Exhibit EX C- Policy - Auto-Owners, #4 Exhibit EX D - Policy Harford Mutual) (Bulfer, William) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less