This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2021 at 08:53:56 (UTC).

Hare v. Allergan, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 Hare filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Allergan, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-10410

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Hare

Defendants

ALLERGAN INC.

INAMED CORPORATION

ALLERGAN USA INC.

ALLERGAN PLC

In Re

ALLERGAN BIOCELL TEXTURED BREAST IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMANDA BLACKWOOD

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

1025 N. 22Nd Street, P.O. Box 127

St. Joseph, MO 64502

JAMES A MONTEE

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

1025 N. 22Nd Street, P.O. Box 127

St. Joseph, MO 64502-0127

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Nebraska; Case Number 8:21-cv-00150. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/29/2021)

6 #1

MDL-Transfer Letter

#6

(#6) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-District of New Jersey, Docket No. 2921. (Attachments: #1 MDL-Transfer Letter)(LAC) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Allergan, Inc. on 4/14/2021. (Montee, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to defendants Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., and Allergan, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Requested as to Allergan Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Montee, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4377187), by Attorney James A. Montee on behalf of Jennifer Hare (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Montee, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMember Case Transferred in on 4/29/21 from the District of Nebraska 8:21-cv-00150 for MDL 2921 ALLERGAN BIOCELL TEXTURED BREAST IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (gh, ) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketJudge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (gh, ) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Nebraska; Case Number 8:21-cv-00150. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-District of New Jersey, Docket No. 2921. (Attachments: #1 MDL-Transfer Letter)(LAC) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Allergan, Inc. on 4/14/2021. (Montee, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to defendants Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., and Allergan, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Requested as to Allergan Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Montee, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4377187), by Attorney James A. Montee on behalf of Jennifer Hare (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Montee, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLERGAN BIOCELL TEXTURED BREAST IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Allergan PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Blackwood