This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:40:24 (UTC).

Hardy v. Equifax Information Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Hardy filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Mahan and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00101

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kerry Hardy

Defendant

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shawn Wayne Miller

Attorney at Krieger Law Group, LLC

5502 S. Fort Apache Road,, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89148

David H. Krieger

Attorney at Krieger Law Group, LLC

5502 S. Fort Apache Road,, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Defendant Attorney

Gia Marina

Attorney at Clark Hill

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 500

Las Vegas, NV 89169

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6768259) by Kerry Hardy. Proof of service due by 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Equifax) (Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Equifax

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kerry Hardy. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (JQC) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kerry Hardy re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 1/24/2022. (Krieger, David) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#5

(#5) Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO CONTINUE (First Request) Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Marina, Gia) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 3/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified deadline on 2/14/2022 (MR). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#7

(#7) Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Marina, Gia) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#9

(#9) Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Marina, Gia) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 4/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 4/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Marina, Gia) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/18/2022. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago Before the Court is what appears to be a duplicate filing of the Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to File Answer (ECF No. 7). The parties previously sought, and the Court granted, an extension of time up to and including March 16, 2022 for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to file its Answer. See ECF Nos. 5, 6.Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to File Answer (ECF No. 7) is DENIED as moot. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Marina, Gia) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 3/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified deadline on 2/14/2022 (MR). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO CONTINUE (First Request) Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Marina, Gia) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kerry Hardy re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 1/24/2022. (Krieger, David) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (JQC) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kerry Hardy. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6768259) by Kerry Hardy. Proof of service due by 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Equifax) (Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gia Marina