This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2021 at 07:02:08 (UTC).

HARDY v. AMAZON.COM, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 HARDY filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AMAZON COM, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-16508

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAQUANA HARDY

Defendants

MEGAN LAST NAME UNKNOWN

ACY1 AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER

AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC

MICHAEL DOUGLAS

DAVID PITTS

AMAZON.COM, LLC

JONATHAN LAST NAME UNKNOWN

BRIANNA LAST NAME UNKNOWN

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.

AMAZON.COM INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CATHERINE WELLINGTON SMITH

Attorney at DEREK SMITH LAW GROUP, PLLC

1835 Market Street, Suite 2950

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARD G. ROSENBLATT

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

502 Carnegie Center

Princeton, NJ 08540-6273

TOVA KATIMS

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

502 Carnegie Center

Princeton, NJ 08540

EMILY C. DESMEDT

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

502 Carnegie Center

Princeton, NJ 08540

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC.. (DESMEDT, EMILY) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHAQUANA HARDY. AMAZON.COM, LLC waiver sent on 11/20/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by TOVA KATIMS on behalf of ACY1 AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC, AMAZON.COM INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC (KATIMS, TOVA) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY C. DESMEDT on behalf of ACY1 AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC, AMAZON.COM INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC (DESMEDT, EMILY) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD G. ROSENBLATT on behalf of ACY1 AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC, AMAZON.COM INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC (ROSENBLATT, RICHARD) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACY1 AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON.COM DEDC, LLC, AMAZON.COM INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, MICHAEL DOUGLAS, DAVID PITTS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketJudge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11683611) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SHAQUANA HARDY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATHERINE W. SMITH