This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2022 at 08:51:37 (UTC).

Hardy et al v. City Of Selma

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 Hardy filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City Of Selma. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry F. Moorer and Sonja F. Bivins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00522

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry F. Moorer

Referral Judge

Sonja F. Bivins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeffrey Hardy

Toriano Neely

Kendall Thomas

Defendants

City Of Selma

Darrio Melton

Sean VanDiver

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Julian L. McPhillips, Jr.

516 South Perry St.

Montgomery, AL 36101

Kyle David Sawyer

Attorney at K. David Sawyer - Attorney at Law

516 South Perry Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorneys

Randall Morgan

Attorney at Hill, Hill, Carter, Franco,

P.O. Box 116

Montgomery, AL 36101-0116

Paul Anthony Clark

1615 17Th Avenue

Central City, NE 38826

Reed Morgan Coleman

Attorney at Hill Hill Carter Franco Cole & Black, P.C.

425 South Perry Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE re: #14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 01/20/2022. (cjr) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#14

(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Morgan, Randall) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#13

(#13) Order re: #12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Sean VanDiver, Darrio Melton. Plaintiffs' Response due by 2/9/2022. Defendants' reply due by 2/17/2022. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/18/2022. (mab) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

12 #1

Exhibit A

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) ORDER, GRANTING #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Melton to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, and EXTENDING deadline to 1/18/2022. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/30/2021. (mab) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Darrio Melton. (Morgan, Randall) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Darrio Melton, Sean VanDiver. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs (McPhillips, Julian) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by City Of Selma. (Morgan, Randall) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Hardy, Toriano Neely, Kendall Thomas. (Sawyer, Kyle) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

4 #1

Consent to Mag

4 #4

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant City Of Selma. (Morgan, Randall) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Record

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE re: #14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 01/20/2022. (cjr) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Bivins. (mab) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Morgan, Randall) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order re: #12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Sean VanDiver, Darrio Melton. Plaintiffs' Response due by 2/9/2022. Defendants' reply due by 2/17/2022. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/18/2022. (mab) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Darrio Melton, Sean VanDiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Morgan, Randall) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER, GRANTING #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Melton to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, and EXTENDING deadline to 1/18/2022. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/30/2021. (mab) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Darrio Melton. (Morgan, Randall) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Documents endorsed NOTED by District Judge Terry F. Moorer: Defendant's #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement, and #5 Plaintiffs' Conflict Disclosure Statement are NOTED. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (mab) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Darrio Melton, Sean VanDiver. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs (McPhillips, Julian) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by City Of Selma. (Morgan, Randall) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to District Judge Terry F. Moorer. Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (cmj) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Hardy, Toriano Neely, Kendall Thomas. (Sawyer, Kyle) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/20/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/6/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by City Of Selma of Filing State Court Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal) (Morgan, Randall) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant City Of Selma. (Morgan, Randall) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2915926, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by City Of Selma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Morgan, Randall) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed Morgan Coleman