This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2019 at 07:03:21 (UTC).

Hardwick v. Goss, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Hardwick filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Goss, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas G. Garaufis and Robert M. Levy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03667

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Izaya Hardwick

New York, NY 10018

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Goss, Inc.

Victor Technologies International, Inc.

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Victor Technologies International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott W Epstein

Attorney at Antin Ehrlich & Epstein

49 West 37Th Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10018

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Howard F. Strongin

Attorney at Strongin Rothman & Abrams, LLP

80 Pine Street, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Michael J. DeSantis

Attorney at Strongin Rothman & Abrams, LLP

80 Pine Street, Ste 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Stipulation extending defendant time to answer) by Goss, Inc.. (Strongin, Howard) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/18/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 IC Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

7 #1

Certificate of Service

1 #4

Jury Demand

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Goss, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

1 #3

Rule 7.1

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Victor Technologies International, Inc. by Goss, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Strongin, Howard) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/25/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. DeSantis on behalf of Goss, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (DeSantis, Michael) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

8 #2

Individual Rules

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Goss, Inc. from Supreme Court Kings County, case number 510987/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11602800) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Rule 7.1, #4 Jury Demand) (Strongin, Howard) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

8 #1

IC Questionnaire

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. DeSantis on behalf of Goss, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (DeSantis, Michael) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/18/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 IC Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Victor Technologies International, Inc. by Goss, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Strongin, Howard) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/1/2019. (Ferrara, Alicia) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Stipulation extending defendant time to answer) by Goss, Inc.. (Strongin, Howard) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Goss, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/25/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Goss, Inc. (Strongin, Howard) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Notice: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM - please answer all questions). Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Goss, Inc. from Supreme Court Kings County, case number 510987/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11602800) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Rule 7.1, #4 Jury Demand) (Strongin, Howard) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.