This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2023 at 08:32:08 (UTC).

Hardison v. Castro et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Hardison filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Castro. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy J. Koppe and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00056

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Hardison

Defendants

Paula Andrea Bedoya Castro

Lyft, Inc. doing business as Lyft

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Clifton Jared Clark

Attorney at Clark Law Group, PLLC

6655 W Sahara Ave Ste A212

Las Vegas, NV 89146

Evan K. Simonsen

Attorney at Clark Law Group, PLLC

6655 W. Sahara Ave.,, Ste. A114

Las Vegas, NV 89146

Defendant Attorneys

Jody Hagins

Attorney at Reisman Sorokac

8965 S Eastern Ave, Ste 382

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Louis E. Garfinkel

Attorney at Reisman Sorokac

8965 S. Eastern Ave, Suite 382

Las Vegas, NV 89123

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit 14-Day Demand

1 #4

Exhibit Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Notice of Removal To Federal Court

#2

(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/11/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/26/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lyft, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Garfinkel, Louis) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 2/3/2023. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (JQC) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Lyft, Inc... (Garfinkel, Louis) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#7

(#7) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Lyft, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/23/2023.(Garfinkel, Louis) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/06/2023)

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendant Lyft, Inc... (Garfinkel, Louis) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION TO REMAND To State Court by Defendant Lyft, Inc.. (Garfinkel, Louis) (remand) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

#11

(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF -cc: Certified Docket Sheet/ Order sent to State Court - JQC) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF -cc: Certified Docket Sheet/ Order sent to State Court - JQC) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO REMAND To State Court by Defendant Lyft, Inc.. (Garfinkel, Louis) (remand) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendant Lyft, Inc... (Garfinkel, Louis) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Lyft, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/23/2023.(Garfinkel, Louis) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Lyft, Inc... (Garfinkel, Louis) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (EDS) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 2/3/2023. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (JQC) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lyft, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Garfinkel, Louis) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/11/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/26/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-22-854149-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7168871) by Lyft, Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit 14-Day Demand, #4 Exhibit Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Notice of Removal To Federal Court) (Garfinkel, Louis) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less