This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:44:22 (UTC).

Harden et al v. Eagle, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Harden filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Eagle, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00877

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wilbert Smith

Gary Harden

Annie Harden

Lisa Stewart

Gregory Harden

Michael Harden

Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

South African Marine Corporation Limited

Ports America Louisiana, L.L.C.

Cargill Marine and Terminal, Inc.

Cargill, Incorporated

Rogers Terminal and Shipping Corporation

SSA Gulf, Inc.

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Owens-Illinois, Inc.

Eagle, Inc.

The McCarty Corporation

Industrial Development Corporation of South Africa Limited

Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.

Eagle Packing & Equipment Co, Inc.

Eagle Asbestos & Packing Co., Inc.

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant

Ports America Louisiana, L.L.C.

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Michael Galante

Attorney at Galante & Bivalacqua

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2615

New Orleans, LA 70130

Damon R. Pourciau

Attorney at Pourciau Law Firm

2200 Veterans Memorial Blvd, Suite 210

Kenner, LA 70062

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Constance Colley Waguespack

Attorney at Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2250

New Orleans, LA 70163

Marcus K Pierre

Attorney at Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum

1100 Poydras St, Suite 2250

New Orleans, LA 70163

Jacques P. DeGruy

Attorney at Pusateri, Barrios, Guillot & Greenbaum

1100 Poydras Street, Ste. 2250

New Orleans, LA 70163

Colin Felicien Lozes

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, & Sommers, LLC

616 Girod Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

James M. Matherne

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer & Sommers, LLC

616 Girod Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Valerie Theng Matherne

Attorney at Courington Kiefer Sommers Marullo & Matherne, LLC

616 Girod Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Barry C. Campbell

Attorney at Frilot, LLC

1100 Poydras, Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Robert E. Williams, IV

Attorney at Sulzer & Williams, L.L.C.

201 Holiday Boulevard, Suite 335

Covington, LA 70433

Richard P. Sulzer

Attorney at Sulzer & Williams, L.L.C.

201 Holiday Boulevard, Suite 335

Covington, LA 70433

Richard J. Garvey, Jr

Attorney at Hailey McNamara Hall Larmann & Papale LLC

One Galleria Blvd, Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001

Christopher Kelly Lightfoot

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara, Hall, Larmann & Papale

One Galleria Boulevard, Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001

Edward J. Lassus, Jr.

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara, Hall, Larman, Papale

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1400, Metairie, La 70001, 2159 Hampshire Dr., Slidell, La 70461

Metairie, LA 70001

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Mary Arthur

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Walter G. Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman, Perry, Watkins, Krutz & Tardy - JAC

P.O. Box 22608, 200 S. Lamar St., Suite 100

Jackson, MS 39225-2608

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Douglas R. Kinler

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Susan G. Keller-Garcia

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

400 Poydras Street, 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Susan G. Keller-Garcia

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

400 Poydras Street, 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70130

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/08/2019. (LT) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER: The Clerk shall administratively terminate this action in his records, without prejudice to the right of the parties to reopen the proceedings. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/13/2020. (LT) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy by Owens-Illinois, Inc. (Arthur, Mary) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 2/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/6/2020. (SGO) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

3 #2

Proposed Pleading;

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Substitute Notice of Removal by Industrial Development Corporation of South Africa Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Keller-Garcia, Susan) Modified on 12/20/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Letter to Attorney Damon R. Pourciau regarding Stephanie M. Hartman who is Co-Counsel for parties Annie Harden, Michael Harden, Gary Harden, Wilbert Smith and Lisa Stewart. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #6

List of Attorneys and Parties in State Court Action

1 #5

Certificate of Filing State Court Record

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Part 2

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Part 1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Third-Party Defendant, Industrial Development Corporation of South Africa, Limited from 18th Judicial District Court for the Parish of West Baton Rouge, Case Number 45074. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2048429), filed by Industrial Development Corporation of South Africa Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Filing State Court Record, #6 List of Attorneys and Parties in State Court Action)(Keller-Garcia, Susan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/8/2020 in accordance with RD 4) (SWE). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/08/2019. (LT) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: The Clerk shall administratively terminate this action in his records, without prejudice to the right of the parties to reopen the proceedings. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/13/2020. (LT) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy by Owens-Illinois, Inc. (Arthur, Mary) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 2/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/6/2020. (SGO) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Substitute Notice of Removal. The Clerk's Office shall substitute R. Doc. 1 with R. Doc. 3-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/6/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Substitute of Removal. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Substitute Notice of Removal by Industrial Development Corporation of South Africa Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Keller-Garcia, Susan) Modified on 12/20/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter to Attorney Damon R. Pourciau regarding Stephanie M. Hartman who is Co-Counsel for parties Annie Harden, Michael Harden, Gary Harden, Wilbert Smith and Lisa Stewart. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Third-Party Defendant, Industrial Development Corporation of South Africa, Limited from 18th Judicial District Court for the Parish of West Baton Rouge, Case Number 45074. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2048429), filed by Industrial Development Corporation of South Africa Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Filing State Court Record, #6 List of Attorneys and Parties in State Court Action)(Keller-Garcia, Susan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/8/2020 in accordance with RD 4) (SWE). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eagle Asbestos & Packing Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Eagle Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. is a litigant