Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 09:09:00 (UTC).

HAQ v. NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 HAQ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp, Tonianne J. Bongiovanni and Zahid N. Quraishi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-10553

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judges

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

Zahid N. Quraishi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAHMUD U. HAQ

Defendants

NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

[ALORICA] EGS FINANCIAL CARE, INC.

THE NEWPORT GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLAS WEINER

Attorney at LIPMAN & PLESUR LLP

500 North Broadway, Suite 105

Jericho, NY 11753

Defendant Attorneys

CHARLES J. VINICOMBE

Attorney at COZEN O'CONNOR

457 Haddonfield Road, Suite 300, P.O. Box 5459

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

EDWARD THOMAS BUTKOVITZ

Attorney at KLEINBARD LLC

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, 5Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

C. ZACHARY ROSENBERG

Attorney at Rottenberg Lipman Rich P.C.

The Helmsley Building, 230 Park Avenue, 18Th Floor, New York

New York, NY 10169

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CONSENT ORDER that the time for Defendants to answer, move,or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to 7/12/2019. It's Ordered that the Conference is adjourned to 9/10/2019 at 3:30pm. It is Further Ordered that the deadline to submit a proposed joint discovery plan is extended to 8/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 5/6/2019. (km) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Nationwide Financial Services, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (VINICOMBE, CHARLES) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

12 #3

Index Ex. C - EGS Email

12 #2

Exhibit Ex. B - The 2017 Amendment

12 #1

Exhibit Ex. A - Welcome Package

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE NEWPORT GROUP, INC., [ALORICA] EGS FINANCIAL CARE, INC., filed by MAHMUD U. HAQ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Welcome Package, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - The 2017 Amendment, #3 Index Ex. C - EGS Email)(WEINER, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES J. VINICOMBE on behalf of NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (VINICOMBE, CHARLES) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

10 #1

Summons

#10

(#10) Letter from Charles Vinicombe, Esq. Requesting Extension of Time for Nationwide to Respond to the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(VINICOMBE, CHARLES) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY of Joinder in & Consent to Notice of Removal (VINICOMBE, CHARLES) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#8

(#8) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant EGS Financial Care, Inc... (BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by THE NEWPORT GROUP, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (ROSENBERG, C.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE NEWPORT GROUP, INC. identifying Newport Group Holdings I, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (ROSENBERG, C.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#5

(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Newport Group, Inc... (ROSENBERG, C.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by C. ZACHARY ROSENBERG on behalf of THE NEWPORT GROUP, INC. (ROSENBERG, C.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit "A"

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EGS FINANCIAL CARE, INC. from Superior Court of Somerset County, NJ, case number SOM L 000353 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9599458), filed by EGS FINANCIAL CARE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni to Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise advised by Judge Quraishi's chambers, all conferences set by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni shall be conducted by Judge Quraishi on the previously scheduled date and time. (in-jal, ) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONSENT ORDER that the time for Defendants to answer, move,or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to 7/12/2019. It's Ordered that the Conference is adjourned to 9/10/2019 at 3:30pm. It is Further Ordered that the deadline to submit a proposed joint discovery plan is extended to 8/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 5/6/2019. (km) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Nationwide Financial Services, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (VINICOMBE, CHARLES) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE NEWPORT GROUP, INC., [ALORICA] EGS FINANCIAL CARE, INC., filed by MAHMUD U. HAQ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Welcome Package, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - The 2017 Amendment, #3 Index Ex. C - EGS Email)(WEINER, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES J. VINICOMBE on behalf of NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (VINICOMBE, CHARLES) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by [ALORICA] EGS FINANCIAL CARE, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/13/2019. (km) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by THE NEWPORT GROUP, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/13/2019. (km) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter from Charles Vinicombe, Esq. Requesting Extension of Time for Nationwide to Respond to the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(VINICOMBE, CHARLES) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY of Joinder in & Consent to Notice of Removal (VINICOMBE, CHARLES) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant EGS Financial Care, Inc... (BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by THE NEWPORT GROUP, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (ROSENBERG, C.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE NEWPORT GROUP, INC. identifying Newport Group Holdings I, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (ROSENBERG, C.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Newport Group, Inc... (ROSENBERG, C.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by C. ZACHARY ROSENBERG on behalf of THE NEWPORT GROUP, INC. (ROSENBERG, C.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2019 03:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/22/2019. (km) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (kas, ) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EGS FINANCIAL CARE, INC. identifying Alorica Customer Care, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EGS FINANCIAL CARE, INC. from Superior Court of Somerset County, NJ, case number SOM L 000353 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9599458), filed by EGS FINANCIAL CARE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer C. ZACHARY ROSENBERG(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles J. Vinicombe Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Thomas Butkovitz