This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:30:40 (UTC).

HAQ v. BTG TRUCKING et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 HAQ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BTG TRUCKING. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Katharine S. Hayden and Cathy L. Waldor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00186

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katharine S. Hayden

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIDAL HAQ

Defendants and Cross Claimants

ABC EMPLOYER I-X

PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

MECHANIC I-X

ABC CORP. I-X

GEVORG GEORGE TATARYAN

BTG TRUCKING

Defendants and Cross Defendants

GEVORG GEORGE TATARYAN

BTG TRUCKING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW F. GARRUTO

609 Franklin Avenue

Nutley, NJ 07110

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

JAMES C. NELSON

Attorney at COOPER MAREN NITSBERG VOSS & DECOURSEY

485 Route 1 South, Bldg A, Suite 200

Iselin, NJ 08830

CHRISTOPHER PAUL MIDURA

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla, L.L.P.

P.O. Box 580

Buffalo, NY 14201

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER PAUL MIDURA

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla, L.L.P.

P.O. Box 580

Buffalo, NY 14201

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BTG TRUCKING. (MIDURA, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to PIP Count by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. (NELSON, JAMES) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#3

(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants BTG Trucking and Gevorg George Tataryan.. (MIDURA, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BTG TRUCKING, GEVORG GEORGE TATARYAN.(MIDURA, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Application to extend Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise reply to Plaintiff's complaint to 1/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/16/2020. (ams, ) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against BTG TRUCKING, GEVORG GEORGE TATARYAN by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY.(NELSON, JAMES) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BTG TRUCKING, GEVORG GEORGE TATARYAN from Superior Court of NJ/Essex, case number ESX-L-6688-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10224566), filed by BTG TRUCKING, GEVORG GEORGE TATARYAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MIDURA, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4D on 4/7/20 a 10:15am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/2/20. (tjg, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to PIP Count by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. (NELSON, JAMES) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against BTG TRUCKING, GEVORG GEORGE TATARYAN by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY.(NELSON, JAMES) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BTG TRUCKING, GEVORG GEORGE TATARYAN.(MIDURA, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Application to extend Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise reply to Plaintiff's complaint to 1/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/16/2020. (ams, ) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants BTG Trucking and Gevorg George Tataryan.. (MIDURA, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action: Should be 28:1441;Jury Demand: Plaintiff requested jury;Origin: Removal; Party information: All parties need to be entered (including Doe defendants) . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BTG TRUCKING. (MIDURA, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BTG TRUCKING, GEVORG GEORGE TATARYAN from Superior Court of NJ/Essex, case number ESX-L-6688-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10224566), filed by BTG TRUCKING, GEVORG GEORGE TATARYAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MIDURA, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.