This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2021 at 09:49:25 (UTC).

Hanson v. Werner Enterprises, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Hanson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Werner Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00245

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sarah Lynne Hanson

Defendants

Werner Enterprises, Inc.

Angelo Miguel Flores

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel Brent Goudarzi

Attorney at Goudarzi & Young

Po Drawer 910

Gilmer, TX 75644-0910

Defendant Attorney

Daniel M Karp

Attorney at Fee Smith Sharp & Vitullo, LLP - Dallas

Three Galleria Tower

13155 Noel Rd, SUIT 1000

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDERAND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2021 03:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/25/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#9

(#9) Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal.. (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#8

(#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sarah Lynne Hanson. (Goudarzi, Joel) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Sarah Lynne Hanson (Goudarzi, Joel) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#6

(#6) ORIGINAL ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Angelo Miguel Flores, Werner Enterprises, Inc. 76th/276th District Court, Morris County, TX, case number 27139.(nkl, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#5

(#5) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against Angelo Miguel Flores, Werner Enterprises, Inc., filed by Sarah Lynne Hanson from 76th/276th District Court, Morris County, TX, case number 27139.(nkl, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Angelo Miguel Flores, Werner Enterprises, Inc. List of Involved Attorneys (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Angelo Miguel Flores, Werner Enterprises, Inc. Index of Pleadings filed in the State Court Action (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Angelo Miguel Flores, Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 76th/276th District Court, Morris County, TX, case number 27139. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8484063), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDERAND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2021 03:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/25/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal.. (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sarah Lynne Hanson. (Goudarzi, Joel) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Sarah Lynne Hanson (Goudarzi, Joel) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORIGINAL ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Angelo Miguel Flores, Werner Enterprises, Inc. 76th/276th District Court, Morris County, TX, case number 27139.(nkl, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against Angelo Miguel Flores, Werner Enterprises, Inc., filed by Sarah Lynne Hanson from 76th/276th District Court, Morris County, TX, case number 27139.(nkl, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Angelo Miguel Flores, Werner Enterprises, Inc. List of Involved Attorneys (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Angelo Miguel Flores, Werner Enterprises, Inc. Index of Pleadings filed in the State Court Action (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Angelo Miguel Flores, Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 76th/276th District Court, Morris County, TX, case number 27139. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8484063), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Werner Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel M Karp