Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/08/2020 at 11:19:20 (UTC).

HANSON v. GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 HANSON filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00061

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward Hanson

Defendant

GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Liebowitz

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza, Ste 305

Valley Stream, NY 11580

Defendant Attorneys

JAY HOLDER SMITH, JR

Po Box 3007

Valdosta, GA 31604-3007

John Holder Smith, Jr.

Attorney at Young, Thagard, LLP

P.O. Box 3007

Valdosta, GA 31604-3007

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/18/2020. Discovery due by 11/6/2020. Motions due by 12/7/2020. Pretrial Order due by 2/4/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 10/6/2020. Status Report due by 11/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 07/23/2020. (MG) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#22

(#22) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Smith, John) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #17 Notice of Filing. Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 7/10/2020. (ca) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#20

(#20) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC. (Smith, John) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#19

(#19) Georgia Dreamworks Realty, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC.(Smith, John) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#18

(#18) REMARK: Copyright Form. (ca) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Filing re #14 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Set Deadlines: Compliance: Applications PHV due by 6/23/2020. (ca) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

14 #1

*Restricted*

#14

(#17) NOTICE of Filing re #14 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Set Deadlines: Compliance: Applications PHV due by 6/23/2020. (ca) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#4

(#8) RESPONSE filed by GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : (SMITH, JAY) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#3

(#3) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to EDWARD HANSON (vs) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC. (vs) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

1 #5

Copyright Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B - Screenshots of the Photographs on the

1 #1

Exhibit A - Photos

#1

(#8) RESPONSE filed by GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : (SMITH, JAY) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/12/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy Clerk prior to scheduled call. (km) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/18/2020. Discovery due by 11/6/2020. Motions due by 12/7/2020. Pretrial Order due by 2/4/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 10/6/2020. Status Report due by 11/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 07/23/2020. (MG) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (ca) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Smith, John) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #17 Notice of Filing. Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 7/10/2020. (ca) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC. (Smith, John) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Georgia Dreamworks Realty, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC.(Smith, John) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REMARK: Copyright Form. (ca) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Filing re #14 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Set Deadlines: Compliance: Applications PHV due by 6/23/2020. (ca) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/9/2020. (ca) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE filed by GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : (SMITH, JAY) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for an extension of time to file Pro Hac Vice Petition and MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : by EDWARD HANSON filed by RICHARD LIEBOWITZ.(LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD) Modified on 5/15/2020 to add docket text(vs). (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and to File Motion to Proceed Pro Hac Vice until 5/15/20. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/24/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : by EDWARD HANSON filed by RICHARD LIEBOWITZ.(LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : by GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC filed by JAY HOLDER SMITH, JR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Oral Argument)(SMITH, JAY) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL RICHARD LIEBOWITZ - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (vs) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to EDWARD HANSON (vs) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to GA DREAMWORKS REALTY LLC. (vs) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by EDWARD HANSON ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. (vs) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GA DREAMWORKS REALTY, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3418641, $400 filed by EDWARD HANSON, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photos, #2 Exhibit B - Screenshots of the Photographs on the Websites, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD) Modified on 3/17/2020 to add Exhibits description (vs). (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Liebowitz