This case was last updated from PACER on 10/31/2020 at 09:35:39 (UTC).

Hanson v. Chapman

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Hanson filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Chapman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leigh Martin May and Alan J. Baverman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03622

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

Referral Judge

Alan J. Baverman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sharon Hanson

Conyers, GA 30013

Defendant

Luther Chapman

Jonesboro, GA 30238

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Remand Letter to Magistrate Court of Clayton County (tmf) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case and REMAND it to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/22/2020. (tmf) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#4

(#4) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal RECOMMENDING that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County, Georgia, on frivolity grounds for want of subject-matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Luther Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#2

(#2) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Magistrate Court of Clayton County re #7 Remand Letter, #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (tmf) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Remand Letter to Magistrate Court of Clayton County (tmf) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (tmf) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Luther Chapman, Sharon Hanson re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (tmf) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case and REMAND it to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/22/2020. (tmf) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal, filed by Luther Chapman, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Luther Chapman, Sharon Hanson re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rjs) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER (found in the #4 RR) granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal RECOMMENDING that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County, Georgia, on frivolity grounds for want of subject-matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/2/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Luther Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Luther Chapman re #2 Order. (eop) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Luther Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less