This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 15:46:10 (UTC).

Hansen v. Mountain America Federal Credit Union et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 Hansen filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Mountain America Federal Credit Union. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Tena Campbell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00583

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tena Campbell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tori Hansen

Defendants

Mountain America Federal Credit Union

Experian Information Solutions

Equifax Information Services

Transunion

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew G. Bagley

Attorney at SECURITY NATIONAL FINANCIAL CORP

5300 S 360 W Ste 300

Murray, UT 84123

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan H. Rupp

Attorney at MOUNTAIN AMERICAN FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

9800 S Monroe St

Sandy, UT 84070

Shane P. Coleman

Attorney at MOUNTAIN AMERICA CREDIT UNION

9800 S Monroe St

Sandy, UT 84070

Chaunceton Bird

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Mountain America Federal Credit Union. (Rupp, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#19

(#19) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Tori Hansen. (Bagley, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

15 #6

Equifax Dispute

15 #5

Declaration of Jonathan Rupp

15 #4

TransUnion Dispute

15 #3

Experian Dispute

15 #2

Declaration of Alexys Harvey

15 #1

Credit Report

15 #15

Main Document

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tori Hansen as to Equifax Information Services Waiver sent on 9/15/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. (Bagley, Matthew) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff(s) must propose a discovery schedule to defendant(s) in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/09/2022. (mh) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Tori Hansen is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Mountain America Federal Credit Union. (Rupp, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • Docket(#21) Case Reassigned to District Judge per docket text order 20 . Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (alf) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF CASE. Consent to jurisdiction of the magistrate judge has not been obtained and based on the pending dispositive motion for dismissal #15 , the court orders that this case be reassigned to a district court judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/18/2022. (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Tori Hansen. (Bagley, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Mountain America Federal Credit Union. (Coleman, Shane) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions identifying Experian plc as Corporate Parent. (Bird, Chaunceton) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions. Attorney Chaunceton Bird added to party Experian Information Solutions(pty:dft)(Bird, Chaunceton) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Mountain America Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Credit Report, #2 Declaration of Alexys Harvey, #3 Experian Dispute, #4 TransUnion Dispute, #5 Declaration of Jonathan Rupp, #6 Equifax Dispute)(Rupp, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan H. Rupp on behalf of Mountain America Federal Credit Union (Rupp, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Terri R. Brown, for Defendant Transunion (alf) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tori Hansen as to Experian Information Solutions served on 9/20/2022, answer due 10/11/2022. (Bagley, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Allison Rhadans, for Defendant Equifax Information Services. (alf) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tori Hansen as to Equifax Information Services Waiver sent on 9/15/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. (Bagley, Matthew) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Experian Information Solutions. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mountain America Federal Credit Union. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Transunion. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff(s) must propose a discovery schedule to defendant(s) in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/09/2022. (mh) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, Experian Information Solutions, Mountain America Federal Credit Union, Transunion (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4441152) filed by Tori Hansen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Bagley, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Tori Hansen is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mountain America Federal Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TransUnion Corp. is a litigant