This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2021 at 09:59:59 (UTC).

Hansen v. Madonna Rehabilitation Hospital et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Hansen filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Madonna Rehabilitation Hospital. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael D. Nelson and John M. Gerrard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-03074

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael D. Nelson

Presiding Judge

John M. Gerrard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Hansen

Defendants

Madonna Rehabilitation Hospital

Bryan Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Maren L. Chaloupka

Attorney at CHALOUPKA LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 1724

Scottsbluff, NE 69363

Defendant Attorneys

Travis W. Tettenborn

Attorney at CLINE, WILLIAMS LAW FIRM - OMAHA

12910 Pierce Street, Suite 200, Sterling Ridge

Omaha, NE 68144-1105

Susan K. Sapp

Attorney at CLINE, WILLIAMS LAW FIRM - LINCOLN

233 South 13Th Street, 1900 Us Bank Building

Lincoln, NE 68508-2095

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • Docket(#10) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Madonna Rehabilitation Hospital. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant, Madonna Rehabilitation Hospital, shall have an extension of time to July 7, 2021, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the amended complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Susan K. Sapp on behalf of Defendant Madonna Rehabilitation Hospital.(Sapp, Susan) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Madonna Rehabilitation Hospital on 5/18/2021. (Chaloupka, Maren) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to defendants Bryan Medical Center and Madonna Rehabilitation Hospital. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Requested as to Bryan Medical Center (a Nebraska non-profit corporation) regarding Amended Complaint #3 . (Chaloupka, Maren) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Requested as to Madonna Rehabilitation Hospital (a Nebraska non-profit corporation) regarding Amended Complaint #3 . (Chaloupka, Maren) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Gary Hansen(Chaloupka, Maren) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Madonna Rehabilitation Hospital ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4375353), by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Gary Hansen(Chaloupka, Maren) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis W. Tettenborn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan K. Sapp