This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2019 at 05:40:28 (UTC).

Hannah v. Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 Hannah filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sean P. Flynn and James S. Moody, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00596

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Hannah

Defendants

Armor Correctional Health Services Inc.

Paula Sanders

Ronald Laughlin

Rick Wells

Dr. Elvira Perez

Carma Ogline

Bernard Montayre

Rose Marie Grether

David Charles Grether, Jr.

Board of County Commissioners of Manatee County, Florida

Leila Polanco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Phillip Fischer

Attorney at Fischer Redavid PLLC

4601 Sheridan St Ste 320

Hollywood, FL 33021-3433

Jordan Redavid

Attorney at Fischer Redavid PLLC

4601 Sheridan St Ste 320

Hollywood, FL 33021-3433

Defendant Attorneys

S. Renee Lundy

Attorney at Dean, Ringers, Morgan & Lawton, PA

201 E Pine St Ste 1200, Po Box 2928

Orlando, FL 32802-2928

Eric J. Netcher

Attorney at Dean, Ringers, Morgan & Lawton, PA

Suite 1200, 201 E Pine St

Orlando, FL 32801

Bruce W. Jolly

Attorney at Purdy, Jolly, Giuffreda & Barranco, PA

2455 E Sunrise Blvd Ste 1216

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33304-3115

Adriana Mihaela Jisa

Attorney at Purdy, Jolly, Giuffreda & Barranco, PA

2455 E Sunrise Blvd Ste 1216

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33304-3115

Christopher J. Stearns

Attorney at Johnson, Anselmo, Murdoch, Burke, Piper & Hochman, PA

2455 E Sunrise Blvd Ste 1000

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33304-3113

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 3/11/2019. (AC) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

21 #1

*Restricted*

#21

(#21) Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-20373. File received electronically (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. granting #15 MOTION to Change Venue to the Middle District of Florida. The Clerk of Court is ordered to transfer the entire case file in the above styled case to the Clerk of Court for the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 3/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Change Venue to the Middle District of Florida by Ronald Laughlin, Rick Wells. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Jisa, Adriana) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

3 #10

Summon(s)

3 #8

Summon(s)

3 #7

Summon(s)

3 #6

Summon(s)

3 #5

Summon(s)

3 #4

Summon(s)

3 #3

Summon(s)

3 #2

Summon(s)

3 #1

Summon(s)

1 #11

Summon(s)

1 #10

Summon(s)

1 #8

Summon(s)

1 #7

Summon(s)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 3/11/2019. (AC) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • (#23) Transferred In from Southern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge James S. Moody Jr. and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New Case Number 8:19-cv-596-T-30SP.(AG) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • (#22) NOTICE to counsel of new case number and judge assignment 8:19-cv-00596-JSM-SPF(signed by deputy clerk). (LSS) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-20373. File received electronically (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. granting #15 MOTION to Change Venue to the Middle District of Florida. The Clerk of Court is ordered to transfer the entire case file in the above styled case to the Clerk of Court for the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 3/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc., Rose Marie Grether, David Charles Grether, Jr., Bernard Montayre, Carma Ogline, Leila Polanco, Paula Sanders. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Netcher, Eric) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Change Venue to the Middle District of Florida by Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc., Rose Marie Grether, David Charles Grether, Jr., Bernard Montayre, Carma Ogline, Leila Polanco, Paula Sanders. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sanders, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Ogline, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Montayre, #4 Affidavit Declarations of Grethers)(Netcher, Eric) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Rick Wells. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Jisa, Adriana) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Ronald Laughlin. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Jisa, Adriana) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Change Venue to the Middle District of Florida by Ronald Laughlin, Rick Wells. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Jisa, Adriana) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adriana Mihaela Jisa on behalf of Ronald Laughlin. Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Ronald Laughlin(pty:dft). (Jisa, Adriana) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce Wallace Jolly on behalf of Rick Wells. Attorney Bruce Wallace Jolly added to party Rick Wells(pty:dft). (Jolly, Bruce) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adriana Mihaela Jisa on behalf of Rick Wells. Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Rick Wells(pty:dft). (Jisa, Adriana) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for improper venue ( Responses due by 3/11/2019) by Board of County Commissioners - Manatee County, FL. Attorney Christopher J. Stearns, Jr added to party Board of County Commissioners - Manatee County, FL(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stearns, Christopher) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by S. Renee Stephens Lundy on behalf of Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc., Rose Marie Grether, David Charles Grether, Jr., Bernard Montayre, Carma Ogline, Leila Polanco, Paula Sanders. Attorney S. Renee Stephens Lundy added to party Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney S. Renee Stephens Lundy added to party Rose Marie Grether(pty:dft), Attorney S. Renee Stephens Lundy added to party David Charles Grether, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney S. Renee Stephens Lundy added to party Bernard Montayre(pty:dft), Attorney S. Renee Stephens Lundy added to party Carma Ogline(pty:dft), Attorney S. Renee Stephens Lundy added to party Leila Polanco(pty:dft), Attorney S. Renee Stephens Lundy added to party Paula Sanders(pty:dft). (Lundy, S. Renee) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PAPERLESS ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document All Defendants. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Patricia Hannah. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 2/21/2019. (jw) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc., Rose Marie Grether, David Charles Grether, Jr., Bernard Montayre, Carma Ogline, Leila Polanco, Paula Sanders. Attorney Eric J Netcher added to party Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric J Netcher added to party Rose Marie Grether(pty:dft), Attorney Eric J Netcher added to party David Charles Grether, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric J Netcher added to party Bernard Montayre(pty:dft), Attorney Eric J Netcher added to party Carma Ogline(pty:dft), Attorney Eric J Netcher added to party Leila Polanco(pty:dft), Attorney Eric J Netcher added to party Paula Sanders(pty:dft). (Netcher, Eric) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc., Board of County Commissioners - Manatee County, FL, Rose Marie Grether, David Charles Grether, Jr., Ronald Laughlin, Bernard Montayre, Carma Ogline, Elvira Perez, Leila Polanco, Paula Sanders, Rick Wells. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s), #11 Summon(s))(ebz) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11347465, filed by Patricia Hannah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract Between MCSO, Manatee County, Armor Correctional, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s), #11 Summon(s), #12 Summon(s), #13 Summon(s), #14 Summon(s))(Redavid, Jordan) [Transferred from flsd on 3/11/2019.] (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less