This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 07:11:38 (UTC).

HANNA v. THE COLLIER COMPANIES, INC. d/b/a THE ENCLAVE APARTMENTS et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 HANNA filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against THE COLLIER COMPANIES, INC d/b/a THE ENCLAVE APARTMENTS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN C WINSOR and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLEN C WINSOR

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARVIN HANNA

Gainesville, FL 32608

Defendants

THE COLLIER COMPANIES, INC. d/b/a THE ENCLAVE APARTMENTS

HELDAN JAX, INC.

HELDAN JAX INC

THE COLLIER COMPANIES INC

THE COLLIER COMPANIES INC doing business as THE ENCLAVE APARTMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BARBARA FERNANDEZ

Attorney at HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LLP - CORAL GABLES FL

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Ste 400

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6044

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Settlement of All Parties by HELDAN JAX INC (FERNANDEZ, BARBARA) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Settlement by HELDAN JAX INC (FERNANDEZ, BARBARA) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HELDAN JAX INC. (FERNANDEZ, BARBARA) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#4

(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/14/2020. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/28/2020., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/27/2020., Discovery due by 4/13/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/3/2020. (kdm) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by HELDAN JAX INC. (FERNANDEZ, BARBARA) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Co-Defendant Consent

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court File

1 #1

Exhibit A - Statement of Claim (state court)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HELDAN JAX, INC. from 8th Judicial Circuit - Alachua County, case number 2019-SC-4593. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4764474.), filed by HELDAN JAX, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Claim (state court), #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Exhibit C - Co-Defendant Consent, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (FERNANDEZ, BARBARA) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #7 NOTICE of Settlement of All Parties. (kdm) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Settlement of All Parties by HELDAN JAX INC (FERNANDEZ, BARBARA) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Settlement by HELDAN JAX INC (FERNANDEZ, BARBARA) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #4 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER -- Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/27/2020. ( *** None filed to date. ***) (kdm) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HELDAN JAX INC. (FERNANDEZ, BARBARA) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/14/2020. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/28/2020., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/27/2020., Discovery due by 4/13/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/3/2020. (kdm) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #3 Answer to #1 Complaint. (kdm) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by HELDAN JAX INC. (FERNANDEZ, BARBARA) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (kdm) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HELDAN JAX, INC. from 8th Judicial Circuit - Alachua County, case number 2019-SC-4593. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4764474.), filed by HELDAN JAX, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Claim (state court), #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Exhibit C - Co-Defendant Consent, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (FERNANDEZ, BARBARA) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less