This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 08:51:35 (UTC).

Hanna v. Homegoods, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Hanna filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Homegoods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurie J. Michelson and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-11089

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurie J. Michelson

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raghida Hanna

Defendants

Homegoods, Inc.

The TJX Companies, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clifford D. Neubauer, Jr.

Attorney at Erskine Law Group

342 S. Main Street

Rochester, MI 48309

Defendant Attorneys

John J. Gillooly

Attorney at Garan Lucow

1155 Brewery Park Blvd., Suite 200

Detroit, MI 48207-2641

Kathleen Marie Griffith

Attorney at Garan Lucow Miller PC

1155 Brewery Park Blvd, Suite 200

Detroit, MI 48207

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 22-005071-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8917256 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Gillooly, John) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Gillooly on behalf of All Defendants. (Gillooly, John) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Gillooly, John) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants identifying Corporate Parent The TJX Companies, Inc. for Homegoods, Inc.. (Gillooly, John) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#5

(#5) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Gillooly, John) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER Regarding Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER TO ATTEND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN. (TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathleen Marie Griffith appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Griffith, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#9

(#9) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Griffith, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Interim Status Conference set for 8/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson; Discovery due by 10/28/2022; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/28/2022. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (Refer to image for additional dates) (EPar) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Interim Status Conference set for 8/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson; Discovery due by 10/28/2022; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/28/2022. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (Refer to image for additional dates) (EPar) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/8/2022. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (EPar) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Griffith, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathleen Marie Griffith appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Griffith, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO ATTEND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN. (TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Regarding Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Gillooly, John) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants identifying Corporate Parent The TJX Companies, Inc. for Homegoods, Inc.. (Gillooly, John) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Gillooly, John) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Gillooly on behalf of All Defendants. (Gillooly, John) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 22-005071-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8917256 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Gillooly, John) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOMEGOODS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where The TJX Companies, Inc. d/b/a T.J.Maxx is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen Marie Griffith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John J. Gillooly