This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2021 at 10:40:45 (UTC).

Hankins v. United Airlines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Hankins filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against United Airlines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Albregts and Andrew P. Gordon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00274

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Hankins

Defendant

United Airlines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bruce D. Tingey

Attorney at Tingey & Tingey

817 S. Main Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Justin Dewey

Attorney at Tingey Injury Law Firm

817 S. Main St.

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan W Carlson

Attorney at McCormick, Barstow, Sheppard, Wayte & Carruth, LLP

8337 W. Sunset Road, Suite 350

Las Vegas, NV 89113

Michael Cutler

Attorney at Victor Rane Group

9350 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 308

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Doug Griffith

Attorney at Victor Rane

9350 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 308

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Richard Lazenby

Attorney at Victor Rane

9350 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 308

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

#20

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/18/2021. Motions due by 9/17/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/13/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#19) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Douglas Griffith is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 4/13/2021 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries; Pla Counsel: Justin Dewey; Def Counsel: Jonathan Carlson and Douglas Griffith; Recording start and end times: 11:04 - 11:11; Courtroom: 3A; This hearing is conducted via video conferencing. The court canvasses and hears representations from the parties. Counsel advise the court that paragraph "J" in the proposed discovery plan and scheduling order #9 is a typo and the parties are not requesting a status conference prior to the entry of the discovery plan and scheduling order. ORDERED the court approves the proposed stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order #9 and will file it separately on the docket. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard Lazenby and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan Carlson. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/7/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Michael Cutler and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan Carlson. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/7/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Douglas Griffith for United Airlines, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan W Carlson. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/7/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard Lazenby and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan Carlson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6435751) by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael Cutler and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan Carlson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6435749) by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Douglas Griffith and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan Carlson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6435740) by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by United Airlines, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/12/2021.(Carlson, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/19/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/6/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Carlson, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by United Airlines, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate United Airlines Holdings, nc. for United Airlines, Inc. added. (Carlson, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-828351-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6374971) by United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carlson, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Airlines, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce D. Tingey