This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 09:18:22 (UTC).

Hanft v. Alltran Financial, LP

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Hanft filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Alltran Financial, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Cowan Wright and Wilhelmina M. Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-02201

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Hanft

Defendant

Alltran Financial, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blake R Bauer

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

9999 Wayzata Blvd.

Minnetonka, MN 55305

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas H Schaefer

Attorney at Erstad & Riemer

8009 34Th Ave S Ste 200

Mpls, MN 55425

Samantha R. Alsadi

Attorney at Erstad & Riemer, P.A.

8009 - 34Th Avenue South, Suite 200

Minneapolis, MN 55425

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Consent Form

#11

(#11) ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/7/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#10

(#10) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Alltran Financial, LP. (Schaefer, Thomas) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Alltran Financial, LP. (Schaefer, Thomas) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Alltran Financial, LP response due 11/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/13/2020.(TMA) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Schaefer, Thomas) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,. Jointly signed by Plaintiff. (STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT) by Alltran Financial, LP. (Schaefer, Thomas) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (MMG). (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Hanft. Alltran Financial, LP served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Bauer, Blake) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Alltran Financial, LP. (MMP) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit(s) 5

1 #4

Exhibit(s) 4

1 #3

Exhibit(s) 3

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8153962) filed by Maria Hanft. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bauer, Blake) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/7/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Alltran Financial, LP. (Schaefer, Thomas) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Alltran Financial, LP. (Schaefer, Thomas) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Alltran Financial, LP response due 11/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/13/2020.(TMA) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Schaefer, Thomas) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,. Jointly signed by Plaintiff. (STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT) by Alltran Financial, LP. (Schaefer, Thomas) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (MMG). (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Hanft. Alltran Financial, LP served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Bauer, Blake) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Alltran Financial, LP. (MMP) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-2201 (WMW/ECW). (MMP) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8153962) filed by Maria Hanft. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bauer, Blake) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less