This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2021 at 08:24:06 (UTC).

Handwerk v. Bayer CropScience LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Handwerk filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bayer CropScience LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen R. Clark and Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00662

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Stephen R. Clark

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Justin Pic

Randi Handwerk

John Vehrenkamp

Defendants

Corteva, Inc.

Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.

BASF Corporation

Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.

CHS Inc.

Growmark Inc.

Tenkoz Inc.

Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.

Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.

Univar Solutions, Inc.

Winfield Solutions, LLC

Bayer CropScience L.P.

Bayer CropScience Inc

Syngenta Corporation

Growmark FS, LLC

Cargill Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel E. Gustafson

Attorney at GUSTAFSON GLUEK PLLC

120 South 6Th St., Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

James Gerard Beebe Dallal

Attorney at COTCHETT PITRE LLP

840 Malcolm Rd., Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Frank T. Davis, Jr

Attorney at FREEDMAN AND BOYD PA

20 First Plaza Nw, Suite 700

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Joseph Goldberg

Attorney at FREEDMAN AND BOYD PA

20 First Plaza Nw, Suite 700

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Adam J. Zapala

Attorney at COTCHETT PITRE LLP

840 Malcolm Rd., Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Nathan D Prosser

8050 West 78Th Street

Edina, MN 55439

Defendant Attorneys

Leslie John

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP - Philadelphia

1735 Market Street, 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

David J. Lender

Attorney at WEIL GOTSHAL LLP - New York

767 Fifth Avenue, Concourse

New York, NY 10153

Lara Bach

Attorney at WEIL GOTSHAL LLP - Miami

1395 Brickell Ave., Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33131

Mary Fee

Attorney at FREDRIKSON AND BYRON PA

200 S. Sixth Street, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1425

Kathy Osborn

300 N. Meridian St., Ste. 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Michael A Lindsay

50 S 6Th St Ste 1500

Mpls, MN 55402-1498

Brandon J. Wheeler

Attorney at FELHABER LARSON PA

220 South 6Th Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4504

Jon M. Woodruff

Attorney at STINSON LLP - Minneapolis

50 S. 6Th St., Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Laura Shores

Attorney at ARNOLD AND PORTER LLP - DC

601 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Christopher M. Hohn

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

Sharon B. Rosenberg

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

Richard G Jensen

Attorney at FABYANSKE AND WESTRA PA

333 South Seventh Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

James J. Long

Attorney at BRIGGS AND MORGAN

332 Minnesota Street, 2200 First National Bank Building

St. Paul, MN 55101

Jevon Bindman

Attorney at Maslon LLP

90 S. Seventh Street, 3300 Wells Fargo Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1254

32 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#148

135 #1

*Restricted*

#135

#133

#132

#130

#126

#125

#124

#123

#122

121 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#121

120 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#120

122 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) IN RE: CROP INPUTS ANTITRUST LITIGATION MDL No. 2993 - ORDER REASSIGNING LITIGATION - The Panel has been notified of the need to reassign the above litigation to another judge in the Eastern District of Missouri. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, with the consent of that court, this litigation is reassigned to the Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Judge, Karen K. CaldwellChair of the Panel. Associated Cases: 4:21-md-02993-SRC et al.(DLB) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (DJO) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketJudge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (CLO) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00351. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DJO) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket(#134) FILED IN ERROR: (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Southern District of Illinois. (kt) Modified text on 6/9/2021 (kt). (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#133) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Stephen R. Clark, Sr. (kt) Modified text on 6/9/2021 (kt). (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES 21-1333 DSD/BRT has been reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis and Judge David S. Doty on 6/7/2021.(MMP) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) TEXT-ONLY ORDER in Response to #130 Letter to Magistrate Judge. With the permission of presiding District Judge Michael J. Davis, and in response to #130 the parties' letter reflecting their agreement and intention that Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. was to be added as a defendant in this matter with the filing of the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, the Clerk of Court is directed to add Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. as a defendant in this matter. This matter remains stayed pursuant to #126 the May 5, 2021 Order of Judge Davis staying all proceedings and deadlines, including but not limited to the filing of additional motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/26/2021. (EB) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Randi Handwerk, Justin Pic, John Vehrenkamp . (Nordin, Daniel) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #116 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathy Osborn for CHS Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karin B. Swope. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8493832 filed by Randi Handwerk. (Looby, Michelle) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Reid W. Gaa. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8493829 filed by Randi Handwerk. (Looby, Michelle) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Frank T. Davis, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8493598 filed by Randi Handwerk. (Looby, Michelle) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Josh B. Ewing. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8493581 filed by Randi Handwerk. (Looby, Michelle) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph Goldberg. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8493556 filed by Randi Handwerk. (Looby, Michelle) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Joseph W. Cotchett, Adam J. Zapala, Karin B. Swope, Elizabeth T. Castillo, James G.B. Dallal, Reid W. Gaa, Joseph Goldberg, Vincent J. Ward, Frank T. Davis, and Josh B. Ewing as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien Ag Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Tenkoz, Inc. (MMP) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Syngenta Corporation, Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. (MMP) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd,4th Antitrust, Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-351 (MJD/TNL). (MMP) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives LTD, Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8467670) filed by Randi Handwerk. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federated Co-operatives Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Tenkoz Inc. is a litigant